EP2423401 - Curtain wall bracket and method of attachment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Levolux A.T. Limited 24 Eastville Close, Eastern Avenue Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL4 3SJ / GB | [2012/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braybrook, Peter 26 Riversley Road Gloucester, Gloucestershire GL2 0QT / GB | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright Patents LLP Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham GL50 1TA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11179089.5 | 26.08.2011 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | GB20100014398 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: GB 201014398 | [2012/19] |
Former [2012/09] | GB20100014398 | 31.08.2010 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2423401 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2423401 | Date: | 01.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04B2/96, E04G5/06 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
E04B2/96 (EP,GB,US);
E04B2/88 (US);
E04F10/00 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Befestigungskonsole für eine Vorhangfassade und Montageverfahren | [2012/09] | English: | Curtain wall bracket and method of attachment | [2012/09] | French: | Console pour mur-rideau et procédé de fixation | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 17.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 31.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2383449 (CLARK HOWARD H); | [A]US4912898 (HOLMES THOMAS G [US]); | [X]US5199236 (ALLEN GLENN R [CA]); | [A]GB2373002 (LEVOLUX AT LTD [GB]) |