EP2423102 - Unmanned submarine and method for operating an unmanned submarine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLAS ELEKTRONIK GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235 28309 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states ATLAS Elektronik GmbH Sebaldsbrücker Heerstrasse 235 28309 Bremen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Richter, Ralf Am Berg 131 28876 Oyten / DE | 02 /
Kalwa, Jörg Habichtweg 50 28844 Weyhe / DE | 03 /
Waltl, Dr. Bernd Carl-Polak-Straße 43 28844 Weyhe / DE | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2013/16] |
Former [2012/09] | Wasiljeff, Johannes M.B. Jabbusch Siekmann & Wasiljeff Patentanwälte Otto-Lilienthal-Strasse 25 28199 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 11179144.8 | 29.08.2011 | [2012/09] | Priority number, date | DE20101035899 | 31.08.2010 Original published format: DE102010035899 | [2012/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2423102 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63G8/00 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
B63G8/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Unbemanntes Unterwasserfahrzeug und Verfahren zum Betrieb eines unbemannten Unterwasserfahrzeugs | [2012/09] | English: | Unmanned submarine and method for operating an unmanned submarine | [2012/09] | French: | Véhicule sous-marin inhabité et procédé de fonctionnement d'un véhicule sous-marin inhabité | [2012/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/41] | 14.09.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/29] | 02.03.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002040782 (RYTLEWSKI GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * paragraphs [0069] , [0070]; figures 16,17 *; | [A]WO2007143457 (SHELL OIL CO [US], et al) [A] 1,11 * page 25, line 29 - page 26, line 12; figure 15 *; | [X]US2008300742 (WEAVER DAVID [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0033] - [0050] , [0058] - [0074]; figures 1,6 *; | [A]US2009114140 (GUERRERO JULIO C [US], et al) [A] 1,11* paragraphs [0018] , [0019]; figure 1 * |