EP2447612 - Method for cleaning a mixed oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thirode Grandes Cuisines Poligny Zone Industrielle Route de Dole 39800 Poligny / FR | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lubrina, Yves Cedex 106 39800 Chaussenans / FR | 02 /
Laget, Fabrice 10 rue de la source de brut 39600 Arbois / FR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Gevers France 23bis, rue de Turin 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 11179315.4 | 30.08.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | FR20100058921 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: FR 1058921 | [2012/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447612 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24C14/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
F24C14/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reinigungsverfahren für einen Kombiofen | [2012/18] | English: | Method for cleaning a mixed oven | [2012/18] | French: | Procédé de nettoyage d'un four mixte | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 12.12.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE19730610 (WIESHEU GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,3,6 * column 3, lines 5-8 ** column 4, lines 1-5 *; | [XY]EP1953458 (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7-9 * figure 2 * * sentences 23-32, paragraph 99 * * sentences 48-49, paragraph 136 * [Y] 2,3,6; | [X]DE102008025294 (RATIONAL AG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * figure 1 * * sentences 7-9, paragraph 50 * |