EP2426039 - Device for taking an item of luggage on a bicycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.05.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kutter, Michael Thiersteinerrain 163 4059 Basel / CH | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Schneider Feldmann AG Patent- und Markenanwälte Beethovenstrasse 49 Postfach 2792 8022 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 11179936.7 | 02.09.2011 | [2012/10] | Priority number, date | CH20100001416 | 02.09.2010 Original published format: CH 14162010 | [2012/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2426039 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B62J1/28, B62J11/00 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
B62J1/28 (EP);
B62J7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Mitnahme eines Gepäckstückes auf einem Zweirad | [2012/10] | English: | Device for taking an item of luggage on a bicycle | [2012/10] | French: | Dispositif de transport d'une pièce de bagage sur un deux roues | [2012/10] | Examination procedure | 07.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 10.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 02.04.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 24.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2023/02] | Public notification(s) | Feststellung eines Rechtsverlusts nach Regel 112 (1) EPÜ (EPA Form 2524 vom 03.06.2022) | Kutter, Michael Thiersteinerrain 163 4059 Basel / CH | [2022/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2014 | 01.10.2021 | 05   M06   Not yet paid | 01.10.2021 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 01.10.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid | 01.10.2021 | 08   M06   Not yet paid | 01.10.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid | 01.10.2021 | 10   M06   Not yet paid | 01.10.2021 | 11   M06   Not yet paid | 30.09.2022 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 08.06.2015 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2015/44] | 01.10.2021 | Resumption of proceedings | [2021/13] | 08.06.2015 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: applicant has died | [2021/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]AT151373B (KOGLER THEODOR ING) [X] 1-4,6-11,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [XI]DE418569 (NIKOLAUS VON HORVATH) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9,10,13-15 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [XAI]AT163274B (HOBEL GEORG) [X] 1,6,7,9-13 * the whole document * [A] 3 [I] 5; | [XI]WO2009018945 (BRESSAN MAURIZIO [IT], et al) [X] 1,3,6-11,13,14 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [XI]DE8622877U (HANS LESSMANN) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,13,15 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [XI]DE408991 (NIKOLAUS VON HORVATH) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,13 * the whole document * [I] 5; | [X]SU1640007 (YAKOVLEV ANATOLIJ V [SU]) [X] 1,2,4,6,15 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2006157957 (BEVER PATRICK T [US]) [X] 1,5 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1A,1B,2A-2C,3A-3C,4A,4B,5A,5B,6A,6B * | by applicant | US5609278 |