EP2568001 - Pre-engineered recyclable product [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.02.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RecuLiner BVBA Overbeekstraat 20 3450 Geetbets / BE | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Pottelbergh, Eric Overbeekstraat 20 3450 Geetbets / BE | 02 /
Verhasselt, Bart R.Selleslaghlaan 7 3450 Geetbets / BE | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | BiiP bv Engels Plein 3 bus 102 3000 Leuven / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | BiiP cvba Culliganlaan 1B 1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE | Application number, filing date | 11180476.1 | 07.09.2011 | [2013/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2568001 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C08J11/06, B29B17/02, D21B1/08 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A01G24/30 (EP,US);
A01G18/20 (EP,US);
A01G24/20 (EP,US);
A01G24/44 (EP,US);
A47C27/122 (EP,US);
B02C23/08 (US);
B02C23/14 (US);
B29B17/04 (US);
B68G1/00 (EP,US);
C08J11/06 (EP,US);
D21B1/08 (EP,US);
D21B1/10 (EP,US);
E04B1/7604 (EP,US);
E04B1/78 (EP,US);
E04B2001/746 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorgefertigtes recycelbares Produkt | [2013/11] | English: | Pre-engineered recyclable product | [2013/11] | French: | Produit recyclable pré-synthétisé | [2013/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/12] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3718536 (DOWNS M, et al) [X] 1,4-6 * Composite board formed from a mass of shredded paper containing thermoplastic material. The paper shreds are made up by chopping paper plies having a coating of polyolefin. In case a particular property is desired, for example, flame resistance, a particular web containing particular additives and/or thermoplastic materials might be used.;; claim 1 * * column 5, line 9 - line 24 * * examples I, IV * * column 9, line 1 - line 11 *; | [A]US4123489 (KELLEY JOSEPH A) [A] 1 * claims 1,7,8 *; | [E]EP2363544 (RECULINER BVBA [BE]) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2011107476 (RECULINER BVBA [BE], et al) [E] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A] - "Release-Liner Waste Management - More than a Burning Issue", PACKAGE PRINT. CONVERTING,, (19920701), vol. 39, no. 7, pages 25 - 27, XP009146986 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | [A] - SKANEM ED - SKANEM, "Skanem turns waste liner paper into hand towels", INTERNET CITATION, (20061212), XP002658361 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4182681 | US5275855 | DE4331567 | JPH07279099 | US6036234 | US2002025421 | WO2005028111 | WO2005110902 | - SASSINE ET AL., J. APP. SCI. RES., (2005), vol. 1, no. 3, page 277 |