EP2426360 - Pump assembly with integrated vibration measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOMA Pumpenfabrik GmbH Industriestrasse 1 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | [2012/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Diesing, Marc Am Schmerbroich 146 53757 Sankt Augustin / DE | 02 /
Senkowski, Martin Frauenstraße 306 A 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | 03 /
Petridis, Vassilios Huven 21 b 53804 Much / DE | [2012/10] | Representative(s) | Oberwalleney, Stephan, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Oberwalleney, Stephan, et al Neumann Müller Oberwalleney & Partner Patentanwälte Overstolzenstrasse 2a 50677 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 11180480.3 | 07.09.2011 | [2012/10] | Priority number, date | DE20101037379 | 07.09.2010 Original published format: DE102010037379 | [2012/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2426360 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2426360 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F04D15/00, F04D13/08 | [2014/36] | CPC: |
F04D15/0088 (EP);
F04D13/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/10] | F04D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Pumpenanordnung mit integrierter Vibrationsmessung | [2012/10] | English: | Pump assembly with integrated vibration measurement | [2012/10] | French: | Agencement de pompes doté d'une mesure de vibrations intégrée | [2012/10] | Examination procedure | 03.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/16] | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 14.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2338801 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 1,9-11,15 * page 8, line 20 - line 26 * * page 12, line 3 - line 5 * * page 14, line 3 - line 15 * * page 16, line 14 - line 15 * * page 29, line 16 - line 32 * * page 30, line 1 - line 32 * * page 31, line 1 - line 12 * * figures 1L,1N,2P,2Q,2R,2S,2T,2U * [I] 3-5,7,8,12-14; | [XI]US2008196887 (MCCOY ROBERT H [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0010] , [0011] , [0030] , [0039] , [0040] , [0041] , [0043] , [0045] * * figures 4,5 * [I] 3-5,7,8,12-14; | [XI]US2002125777 (PARMETER LARRY JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1,11,14 * paragraphs [0004] , [0016] , [0030] , [0031] , [0032] , [0033] * * figure 5b * [I] 3-5,7,8,12,13; | [A]JPH10205478 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,3,4,8 * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2001235362 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO) [A] 1,7 * abstract * * figure 3 * | by applicant | DE202004009580U | DE102008038661 | DE19956768 | DE19617570 | DE102009005154 | GB2450157 |