EP2567631 - Barefoot shoe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Peitzker, Jörg Buchholzer Weg 17 41189 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2013/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/11] | Representative(s) | Bonsmann, Joachim Bernhard, et al Bonsmann . Bonsmann . Frank Patentanwälte Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35 a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/11] | Bonsmann, Joachim Bernhard, et al Bonsmann & Bonsmann Patentanwälte Kaldenkirchener Strasse 35 a 41063 Mönchengladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11180485.2 | 07.09.2011 | [2013/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2567631 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A43B13/10, A43B1/08, A43B3/00, A43C1/06, A43C11/00, A43C15/02, A43C15/18, A43B13/12, A43B13/22, A43B13/04, A43C11/08, A43B23/02, A43B23/08, A41B11/00, A41D19/015, A41D31/00 | [2013/11] | CPC: |
A43B1/08 (EP,US);
A43B3/122 (US);
A41B11/007 (EP,US);
A43B1/04 (EP);
A43B1/10 (US);
A43B13/04 (EP,US);
A43B13/10 (EP,US);
A43B13/122 (EP,US);
A43B13/22 (EP,US);
A43B23/023 (EP,US);
A43B23/0245 (EP,US);
A43B23/088 (EP,US);
A43B3/0042 (EP,US);
A43B3/128 (US);
A43C1/06 (EP,US);
A43C11/002 (EP,US);
A43C11/004 (EP,US);
A43C11/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Barfussschuh | [2013/11] | English: | Barefoot shoe | [2013/11] | French: | Chaussure nu-pieds | [2013/11] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/11] | 22.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/11] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4841577 (LARS-JOS PEHR [SE]) |