EP2428784 - Torque and speed sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. 98, Huam-ro, Jung-gu Seoul, 04637 / KR | [2017/20] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states LG Innotek Co., Ltd. Seoul Square 20F 541, Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-714 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kang, Minchul C/O LG INNOTEK CO., LTD 20th Fl. Seoul Square 541 Namdaemunno 5-ga Jung-gu 100-714 SEOUL / KR | [2012/11] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/11] | Novagraaf Technologies 122 rue Edouard Vaillant 92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 11180719.4 | 09.09.2011 | [2012/11] | Priority number, date | KR20100089367 | 13.09.2010 Original published format: KR 20100089367 | [2012/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2428784 | Date: | 14.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01L3/10, G01L5/22, G01D5/14 | [2012/11] | CPC: |
G01L3/104 (EP,US);
G01L3/101 (KR);
B62D6/10 (KR);
G01D5/12 (KR);
G01D5/145 (EP,KR,US);
G01L3/109 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/11] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Drehmoment- und Geschwindigkeitssensor | [2012/11] | English: | Torque and speed sensor | [2012/11] | French: | Capteur de couple et de vitesse | [2012/11] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/42] | 12.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/25] | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.11.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102005038516 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-6* paragraphs [0030] - [0035]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | KR20100089367 |