EP2474345 - Communication system, information processing apparatus, communication program, and communication method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.02.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto 601-8501 / JP | [2012/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Araki, Tsutomi c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Ryutaro c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | 03 /
Kurata, Megumi c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | 04 /
Shibaguchi, Seiji c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | 05 /
Kobayashi, Masayoshi c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | 06 /
Goda, Teruhiko c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | 07 /
Tokunaga, Eiji c/o Nintendo Co., Ltd. 11-1 Kamitoba Hokotate-cho Minami-ku Kyoto, 601-8501 / JP | [2012/28] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/28] | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11180756.6 | 09.09.2011 | [2012/28] | Priority number, date | JP20110001525 | 06.01.2011 Original published format: JP 2011001525 | [2012/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2474345 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/12 | [2012/28] | CPC: |
A63F13/77 (EP,US);
A63F13/327 (EP,US);
A63F13/31 (EP,US);
A63F13/26 (EP);
A63F13/95 (EP);
A63F2300/405 (EP,US);
A63F2300/552 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kommunikationssystem, Informationsverarbeitungsvorrichtung, Kommunikationsprogramm und Kommunikationsverfahren | [2012/28] | English: | Communication system, information processing apparatus, communication program, and communication method | [2012/28] | French: | Système de communication, appareil de traitement d'informations, programme de communication et procédé de communication | [2012/28] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/09] | 09.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.09.2019 | 25.09.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/12] | 08.11.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009088259 (GOSZTYLA JEFFREY [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] *; | [I]WO2004025655 (IGT RENO NEV [US]) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0025] *; | [I]WO2008063579 (NINTENDO CO LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0130]; claim 12 *; | [A]JP2007125118 (NINTENDO CO LTD) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2009088247 (OBERG GREGORY KEITH [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0044] *; | [A]US2006106963 (SASAKI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0078] - paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US2010144430 (GRAHAM FRASER H [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] *; | [A]US2007037625 (EDWARDS DAVID C [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0187] - paragraph [0191] * | by applicant | JP2011001525 | JP3679111B | JP3699471B | JP3790257B | JP3790261B | JP3790263B | JP3790264B | JP4456611B | JP3874785B | JP4324487B |