EP2436522 - Image Forming Apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | For all designated states Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itogawa, Yoshihiro BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA, Intellectual Property Dept. 1-1-1 Kawagishi Mizuho-ku Nagoya, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Smith, Samuel Leonard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/14] | Application number, filing date | 11181279.8 | 14.09.2011 | [2012/14] | Priority number, date | JP20100221672 | 30.09.2010 Original published format: JP 2010221672 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2436522 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2436522 | Date: | 12.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2436522 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/21, B41J2/18 | [2012/50] | CPC: |
B41J2/17566 (EP,US);
B41J2/175 (EP,US);
B41J2/17509 (EP,US);
B41J2/1752 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/18 (EP,US);
B41J2/2114 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/14] | B41J2/175 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Title | German: | Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung | [2012/14] | English: | Image Forming Apparatus | [2012/14] | French: | Appareil de formation d'images | [2012/14] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/30] | 24.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2011 | AL | 13.11.2013 | AT | 13.11.2013 | BE | 13.11.2013 | BG | 13.11.2013 | CY | 13.11.2013 | CZ | 13.11.2013 | DK | 13.11.2013 | EE | 13.11.2013 | ES | 13.11.2013 | FI | 13.11.2013 | HR | 13.11.2013 | IT | 13.11.2013 | LT | 13.11.2013 | LV | 13.11.2013 | MC | 13.11.2013 | MK | 13.11.2013 | MT | 13.11.2013 | NL | 13.11.2013 | PL | 13.11.2013 | RO | 13.11.2013 | RS | 13.11.2013 | SE | 13.11.2013 | SI | 13.11.2013 | SK | 13.11.2013 | SM | 13.11.2013 | TR | 13.11.2013 | NO | 13.02.2014 | GR | 14.02.2014 | IS | 13.03.2014 | PT | 13.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 14.09.2011 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MK | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.09.2011 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
TR | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.09.2011 | |
AT | 13.11.2013 | ||
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
BG | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
MT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
GR | 14.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
SM | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
IT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
MC | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SI | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
DK | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
PL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RO | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
SK | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
EE | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
PT | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
BE | 13.11.2013 | ||
CY | 13.11.2013 | ||
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
LV | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 13.11.2013 | |
ES | 13.11.2013 | ||
FI | 13.11.2013 | ||
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
RS | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
HR | 13.11.2013 | ||
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
IS | 13.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 13.11.2013 | |
LT | 13.11.2013 | ||
NL | 13.11.2013 | ||
SE | 13.11.2013 | ||
NO | 13.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 13.11.2013 | |
NO | 13.02.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH08216391 (CANON KK) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1386742 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1,2,5 *; | [A]US2009040262 (WATANABE TOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0070]; figure 1 *; | [A]JPS5763285 (EPSON CORP) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH09141841 | JPH08216391 |