blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2466441

EP2466441 - Mobile terminal and method for controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  03.07.2020
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip03.07.2020Refusal of applicationpublished on 05.08.2020  [2020/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20, Yoido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
Seoul 150-721 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
20 Yoido-Dong Youngdungpo-ku Seoul
150-721 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Taehun
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group,
60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumcheon-gu
153-801 Seoul / KR
02 / Park, Jieun
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group,
60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumcheon-gu
153-801 Seoul / KR
03 / Hong, Nayoung
LG Electronics Inc. IP Group,
60-39 Kasan-dong
Kumcheon-gu
153-801 Seoul / KR
 [2012/25]
Representative(s)Plasseraud IP
104 Rue de Richelieu
CS92104
75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/25]Cabinet Plasseraud
52, rue de la Victoire
75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Application number, filing date11181810.019.09.2011
[2012/25]
Priority number, dateKR2010012982017.12.2010         Original published format: KR 20100129820
[2012/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2466441
Date:20.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2466441
Date:03.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.06.2013
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/048
[2012/25]
CPC:
G06F3/04883 (EP,KR,US); G06F1/1626 (EP,KR,US); G06F3/017 (KR);
G06F3/0412 (KR); G06F3/0484 (KR); G06F3/14 (KR);
H04B1/401 (KR); G06F2203/04101 (KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2012/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Tragbares Endgerät und Verfahren zu dessen Steuerung[2012/25]
English:Mobile terminal and method for controlling the same[2012/25]
French:Terminal mobile et procédé de commande de celui-ci[2012/25]
Examination procedure02.01.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/08]
24.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.2020Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32]
30.01.2020Date of oral proceedings
12.03.2020Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
17.03.2020Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
22.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 07
25.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 08
24.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005052427  (WU MICHAEL CHI HUNG [CA], et al);
 [A]WO2007061057  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al);
 [I]US2009228841  (HILDRETH EVAN [CA]);
 [XI]US2010026649  (SHIMIZU TOMOYUKI [JP], et al);
 [A]US2010306649  (RUSS V KEVIN [US], et al);
ExaminationUS2013322785
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.