EP2441712 - Loom and charging station [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Krones Aktiengesellschaft Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wegener, Kai Dr. Mainburger Str. 26 81369 München / DE | 02 /
Kirschner, Peter Lampersberg 27 83139 Söchtenau / DE | [2012/33] |
Former [2012/16] | 01 /
Wegener, Kai Dr. Hofmannstraße 36b 81379 München / DE | ||
02 /
Kirschner, Peter Lampersberg 27 83139 Söchtenau / DE | Representative(s) | Benninger, Johannes Benninger Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Leo-Ritter-Strasse 5 93049 Regensburg / DE | [2013/43] |
Former [2012/16] | Benninger, Johannes Benninger & Eichler-Stahlberg Patentanwälte Dechbettener Strasse 10 93049 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 11182232.6 | 21.09.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | DE20101048524 | 14.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010048524 | [2012/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441712 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2441712 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G57/06, B65G57/24 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
B65G57/06 (EP);
B65G57/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | Greiferkopf und Beladestation | [2012/16] | English: | Loom and charging station | [2012/16] | French: | Tête de poignée et station de chargement | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/23] | 23.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2011 | AL | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MK | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | RS | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | SM | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MK | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
SM | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RS | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2010047595 (RSW IP BV [NL], et al) [A] 1,7,11 * page 8, line 23 - page 11, line 4 * * figures 1-11 *; | [A]DE4206038 (KHS VERPACKUNGSTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,7,11 * column 2, line 28 - line 59 * * figure 1 *; | [A]DE4213352 (LANGHAMMER HEINRICH [DE]) [A] 1,7,11 * column 2, line 3 - column 2, line 62 * * figure 1 *; | [A]FR2436727 (LAESSIG FOERDERTECH HAMBURG [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]KR20090047747 (ROBOSS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | DE19626826 |