EP2458549 - Communication terminal, communication method, communication instrument, and communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odaka, Kentaro c/o Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2012/22] | Turner, James Arthur D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 11182244.1 | 21.09.2011 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | JP20100263819 | 26.11.2010 Original published format: JP 2010263819 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2458549 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2458549 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06, H04L29/08, G06F21/10 | [2016/10] | CPC: |
H04L67/06 (EP,US);
G06F21/10 (EP,US);
G06Q30/0601 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | G06Q30/06, H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Title | German: | Kommunikationsendgerät, Kommunikationsverfahren, Kommunikationsinstrument und Kommunikationssystem | [2012/22] | English: | Communication terminal, communication method, communication instrument, and communication system | [2012/22] | French: | Terminal de communication, procédé de communication, instrument de communication et système de communication | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/22] | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 21.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.09.2011 | AL | 03.08.2016 | AT | 03.08.2016 | BE | 03.08.2016 | CY | 03.08.2016 | CZ | 03.08.2016 | DK | 03.08.2016 | EE | 03.08.2016 | ES | 03.08.2016 | FI | 03.08.2016 | HR | 03.08.2016 | IT | 03.08.2016 | LT | 03.08.2016 | LV | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | NL | 03.08.2016 | PL | 03.08.2016 | RO | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SE | 03.08.2016 | SI | 03.08.2016 | SK | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | TR | 03.08.2016 | IE | 21.09.2016 | LU | 21.09.2016 | CH | 30.09.2016 | LI | 30.09.2016 | MT | 30.09.2016 | BG | 03.11.2016 | NO | 03.11.2016 | GR | 04.11.2016 | IS | 03.12.2016 | PT | 05.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
MT | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
TR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.09.2011 | |
AT | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CY | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
MK | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
LU | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SI | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
CH | 30.09.2016 | ||
LI | 30.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.09.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
DK | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
BE | 03.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 03.08.2016 | ||
EE | 03.08.2016 | ||
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RO | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
SK | 03.08.2016 | ||
BG | 03.11.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LV | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 03.08.2016 | |
ES | 03.08.2016 | ||
FI | 03.08.2016 | ||
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
GR | 04.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
PT | 05.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
HR | 03.08.2016 | ||
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
PL | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SE | 03.08.2016 | ||
BE | 30.09.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
IS | 03.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 03.08.2016 | |
IT | 03.08.2016 | ||
LT | 03.08.2016 | ||
NL | 03.08.2016 | ||
NO | 03.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 03.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003154486 (DUNN MATTHEW W [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0033] ** paragraph [0074] *; | [I]US2007198363 (QUOC MICHAEL [US], et al) [I] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0059] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0070] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0136] * * paragraph [0154] * * paragraph [0169] - paragraph [0175] * * figure 1 *; | [IA]US2010218207 (JAGMAG ADIL [US]) [I] 1,10-12 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] * [A] 2-9,13,14 | Examination | US2007220575 | US2008248740 | by applicant | JP2006059328 | JP2010263819 |