EP2436265 - Disinfective cleaning composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coop Genossenschaft Thiersteinerallee 12 4053 Basel / CH | [2012/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Shan-Jia Buechwiesenstrasse 7 8544 Attikon / CH | 02 /
Wirz, Irene Brenggau 8492 Wila / CH | 03 /
Müller, Beat Zürichweg 9 8153 Rümlang / CH | 04 /
Lattmann, Ursula Willikon 78 8618 Oetwil am See / CH | [2012/14] | Representative(s) | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Braun, André jr. Braunpat Braun Eder AG Reussstrasse 22 4054 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 11182303.5 | 22.09.2011 | [2012/14] | Priority number, date | CH20100001587 | 29.09.2010 Original published format: CH 15872010 | [2012/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2436265 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2436265 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N37/16, A01N59/00, A01P1/00, A61L2/18, D06L1/12, D06L3/02, C11D3/39, C11D3/48 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
A01N37/16 (EP);
A01N59/00 (EP);
A61L2/186 (EP);
C11D1/83 (EP);
C11D3/2079 (EP);
C11D3/33 (EP);
C11D3/3947 (EP);
C11D3/48 (EP);
D06L1/12 (EP);
D06L4/12 (EP);
D06L4/13 (EP);
D06L4/15 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N37/16, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N37/16, A01N25/32, A01N37/02, A01N59/00 (EP);
A01N59/00, A01N2300/00 (EP);
A01N59/00, A01N25/32, A01N37/02 (EP) |
Former IPC [2012/14] | A01N37/16, A01N59/00, A01P1/00, A61L2/18, D06L1/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Desinfizierende Reinigungszusammensetzung | [2012/14] | English: | Disinfective cleaning composition | [2012/14] | French: | Composition de nettoyage désinfectant | [2012/14] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/18] | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0148136 (HENKEL ECOLAB GMBH & CO OHG [DE], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, paragraphs 4-5 * * page 3, paragraph 8 - page 4, paragraph 7 * * page 6, paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 6 * * examples 1-3; table 1.2 *; | [Y]WO9626999 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 2, paragraphs 2-5 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 9, paragraph 4 * * page 11, paragraph 2 * * page 12, paragraph 4 * * page 14, paragraph 2 * * Compositions IV (pages 21/23) *; | [Y]DE10032588 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0010] - [0013] - [0016] , [0020] * * examples 1,2; tables 1-3 *; | [YD]WO9528471 (ECOLAB INC [US]) [YD] 1-15 * page 4, lines 27-36 * * page 7, line 28 - page 8, line 4 * * page 9, lines 3-5,18-22,30-37 * * page 10, lines 31-35 * * page 11, lines 18-24 * * page 22, lines 27-31 * * page 13, lines 14-37 * * page 19, lines 3-30 *; | [YD]US6168808 (HAMON GODIN CATHERINE [FR], et al) [YD] 1-15 * column 1, lines 8-12, 31-43 * * column 2, line 36 - column 3, line 19 * * column 5, lines 40-51 * | by applicant | WO2004108171 | US6168808 | WO2005001011 | US6257253 | US2010076082 |