EP2444041 - Compression garment apparatus having support bladder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/17] | Compression Garment Apparatus Having Support Bladder | ||
[2014/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states Tyco Healthcare Group, LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mahli, Arnaz 39 Brandley Road Watertown, MA Massachusetts 02472 / US | 02 /
Deshpande, Manish 34 Apple Blossom Way Canton, MA Massachusetts 02021 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2012/17] | Gray, James Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 11182432.2 | 23.09.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | US20100893683 | 29.09.2010 Original published format: US 893683 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444041 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444041 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/08, A61H23/04 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
A61F13/085 (EP,US);
A61F5/30 (KR);
A61H1/008 (US);
A41D1/00 (KR);
A61F5/34 (KR);
A61H9/0092 (EP,US);
A61H2201/165 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5058 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5064 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5071 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5084 (EP,US);
A61H2205/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | Kompressionskleidungsvorrichtung mit Hilfsblase | [2012/17] | English: | Compression garment apparatus having support bladder | [2014/33] | French: | Appareil de vêtement de compression doté d'une vessie de support | [2012/17] |
Former [2012/17] | Compression Garment Apparatus Having Support Bladder | Examination procedure | 23.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/17] | 25.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2011 | AL | 24.12.2014 | AT | 24.12.2014 | BE | 24.12.2014 | BG | 24.12.2014 | CY | 24.12.2014 | CZ | 24.12.2014 | DK | 24.12.2014 | EE | 24.12.2014 | ES | 24.12.2014 | FI | 24.12.2014 | HR | 24.12.2014 | IT | 24.12.2014 | LT | 24.12.2014 | LV | 24.12.2014 | MC | 24.12.2014 | MK | 24.12.2014 | MT | 24.12.2014 | NL | 24.12.2014 | PL | 24.12.2014 | PT | 24.12.2014 | RO | 24.12.2014 | RS | 24.12.2014 | SE | 24.12.2014 | SI | 24.12.2014 | SK | 24.12.2014 | SM | 24.12.2014 | TR | 24.12.2014 | NO | 24.03.2015 | GR | 25.03.2015 | IS | 24.04.2015 | IE | 23.09.2015 | LU | 23.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/37] | HU | 23.09.2011 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PT | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 23.09.2011 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MK | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 23.09.2011 | |
AT | 24.12.2014 | ||
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
BG | 24.12.2014 | ||
CY | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
SM | 24.12.2014 | ||
TR | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
MT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
IE | 23.09.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
BE | 24.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
MC | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
LU | 23.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SI | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
IT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
DK | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 24.12.2014 | |
CZ | 24.12.2014 | ||
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
IS | 24.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
PL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
SK | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CZ | 24.12.2014 | |
EE | 24.12.2014 | ||
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RO | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | EE | 24.12.2014 | |
ES | 24.12.2014 | ||
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 24.12.2014 | |
FI | 24.12.2014 | ||
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
NL | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
HR | 24.12.2014 | ||
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
LV | 24.12.2014 | ||
RS | 24.12.2014 | ||
SE | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
GR | 25.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 24.12.2014 | |
LT | 24.12.2014 | ||
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 24.12.2014 | |
NO | 24.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 24.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002104535 (BIONDO JOHN P [US], et al) [X] 1-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0112] , [0113]; figure -; claim - * [I] 11,12; | [A]US2006036203 (OUCHENE AMINA [FR], et al) [A] 1,10 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2009177222 (BROWN JENNIE [US], et al) [A] 1* figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US20080241670 | US20080241936 |