EP2400533 - Diamond semiconductor element and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/52] | Diamond field effect transistor and process for producing the same | ||
[2018/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Telegraph And Telephone Corporation 3-1 Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8116 / JP | [2011/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kasu, Makoto c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 02 /
Makimoto, Toshiki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 03 /
Ueda, Kenji c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | 04 /
Yamauchi, Yoshiharu c/o NTT Electronics Techno Corporation 1-32, Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | [2012/26] |
Former [2012/23] | 01 /
Kasu, Makoto c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Makimoto, Toshiki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Ueda, Kenji c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamuchi, Yoshiharu c/o NTT Electronics Techno Corporation 1-32, Shin-urashimacho 1-chome Kanagawa-ku, Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0031 / JP | |||
Former [2011/52] | 01 /
Kasu, Makoto c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | ||
02 /
Makimoto, Toshiki c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
03 /
Ueda, Kenji c/o NTT Intellectual Property Center 9-11, Midori-cho, 3-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 180-8585 / JP | |||
04 /
Yamauchi, Yoshiharu c/o NTT Electronics Techno Corporation 12, Sakae-cho 3-chome, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0052 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 11182463.7 | 20.06.2006 | [2011/52] | Priority number, date | JP20050179751 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005179751 | JP20050270541 | 16.09.2005 Original published format: JP 2005270541 | JP20050307231 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: JP 2005307231 | JP20060061838 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006061838 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2400533 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2400533 | Date: | 22.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2400533 | Date: | 15.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/812, H01L21/338 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
H01L21/324 (EP,US);
H01L21/18 (KR);
C23C16/27 (KR);
C23C16/274 (EP,US);
C23C16/278 (EP,US);
C30B25/105 (EP,US);
C30B29/04 (EP,US);
C30B33/02 (EP,US);
C30B33/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/02013 (EP,US);
H01L21/02027 (EP,US);
H01L21/02376 (EP,US);
H01L21/02433 (EP,US);
H01L21/02527 (EP,US);
H01L21/02579 (EP,US);
H01L21/02609 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L21/0405 (EP,US);
H01L21/0415 (EP,US);
H01L29/045 (EP,US);
H01L29/45 (EP,US);
H01L29/66037 (EP,US);
H01L29/66045 (EP,US);
H01L29/66742 (EP,US);
H01L29/66856 (EP,US);
H01L29/73 (KR);
H01L29/732 (EP,US);
H01L29/78684 (EP,US);
H01L29/812 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/0054 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/52] | H01L21/338, H01L29/812, H01L29/45 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2019/20] |
Former [2011/52] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Diamant Halbleiterbauelement und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2018/50] | English: | Diamond semiconductor element and process for producing the same | [2018/50] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur en diamant et procédé pour sa fabrication | [2018/50] |
Former [2011/52] | Diamant Feldeffekttransistor und Verfahren zur Herstellung | ||
Former [2011/52] | Diamond field effect transistor and process for producing the same | ||
Former [2011/52] | Transistor à effet de champ en diamant et procédé pour sa fabrication | Examination procedure | 22.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/40] | 05.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06766995.2 / EP1895579 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060766995) is 15.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0439114 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]JPH03222436 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 13,14 * the whole document *; | [XYI]GB2258760 (KOBE STEEL LTD [JP]) [X] 1,6 * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 22; figure 1 * [Y] 11-14 [I] 4,5,9,10; | [A]EP0702413 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y] - HIROSHI KAWARADA ET AL, "ENHANCEMENT MODE METAL-SEMICONDUCTOR FIELD EFFECT TRANSISTORS USINGHOMOEPITAXIAL DIAMONDS", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AIP, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS, MELVILLE, NY, US, (19940919), vol. 65, no. 12, doi:10.1063/1.112915, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1563 - 1565, XP000470284 [Y] 11,12 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.112915 | [A] - YUHONG CAI ET AL, "Ti/Ni/Au/diamond MIS field effect transistors with TiO2 gate dielectri", vol. 744, doi:10.1557/PROC-744-M8.8, ISBN 978-1-55899-681-6, (20030101), pages M8.8.1 - M8.8.6, PROGRESS IN SEMICONDUCTORS II - ELECTRONIC AND OPTOELECTRONIC APPLICATIONS: SYMPOSIUM HELD DECEMBER 2 - 5, 2002, BOSTON, MASSACHUSETTS, U.S.A. (IN: MATERIALS RESEARCH SOCIETY SYMPOSIUM PROCEEDINGS), M, URL: http://journals.cambridge.org/abstract_S1946427400154703, XP008146375 [A] 11,12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1557/PROC-744-M8.8 | by applicant | JPH0815162 | EP1895579 | - MAKOTO KASU ET AL., "High-frequency characteristics of diamond MESFET", JOURNAL OF THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS ''APPLIED PHYSICS, (200403), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 363 - 367, XP008105736 | - C. KITTEL, Introduction to Solid State Physics, MARUZEN, pages 11 - 22 | - MAKOTO KASU, "High-frequency characteristics of diamond MESFET", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, THE JAPAN SOCIETY OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (2004), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 0363 - 0367, XP008105736 | - M. KASU, "Influence of epitaxy on hydrogen-passivated diamond", DIAMOND AND RELATED MATERIALS, (2004), pages 226 - 232 | - J. RUAN ET AL., "Cathodoluminescence and annealing study of plasma - deposited polycrystalline diamond films", J. APPL. PHYS, (19910501), vol. 69, no. 9 | - KASU ET AL., "High-frequency characteristics of diamond MESFET", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, (2004), vol. 73, no. 3, pages 363 - 367, XP008105736 | - F. P. BUNDY, H. P. BOVENKERK, H. M. STRONG, R. H. WENTORF, "Diamond-Graphite Equilibrium Line from Growth and Graphitization of Diamond", THE JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL PHYSICS, (196108), vol. 35M, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1063/1.1731938, page 383, XP008105744 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.1731938 | EP20060766995 |