EP2402723 - Gas metering [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sentec Ltd 5 The Westbrook Centre Milton Road, Cambridge CB4 1YG / GB | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Colby, Edward Grellier 7 Magrath Avenue Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 3AH / GB | 02 /
Steiner, Hans Joachim 75 Derwent Close Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB1 8DY / GB | 03 /
Roussopoulos, Kimon 204 Chesterton Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB4 1NE / GB | 04 /
Storkey, Matthew Emmanuel Milton 166 Foster Road Trumpington Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB2 2JP / GB | 05 /
Shakespeare, Simon Adam 1 Weavers Field Girton Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0XB / GB | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Suite 2 The Old Dairy Elm Farm Business Park Wymondham Norwich, Norfolk NR18 0SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | ip21 Ltd Central Formalities Department Lakeside 300 Old Chapel Way Broadland Business Park Norwich Norfolk NR7 0WG / GB | Application number, filing date | 11182883.6 | 05.10.2006 | [2012/01] | Priority number, date | GB20050025305 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0525305 | GB20050025307 | 13.12.2005 Original published format: GB 0525307 | [2012/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2402723 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2402723 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01F1/708, G01F1/704 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
G01F1/7046 (EP,US);
G01F1/08 (KR);
G01F1/704 (KR);
G01F1/7088 (EP,KR,US);
H03M1/124 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/01] | Title | German: | Zälen von Gas | [2013/42] | English: | Gas metering | [2012/01] | French: | Comptage de gaz | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/01] | Zählen von Gas | ||
Former [2012/01] | Comptage de gaz | Examination procedure | 22.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 20.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/30] | 10.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/30] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06794661.6 / EP1960743 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20060794661) is 24.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4019383 (WIEGAND JR WALTER J, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 4 *; | [A]US4248086 (ZIZINE JEAN L) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** column 3 - column 4 *; | [A]US4393719 (WIEGAND WALTER J, et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 53,54 * * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 24 * | by applicant | US2632326 | US3688106 | US3842670 |