EP2575040 - Method for processing interruption requirements of a data processing device and virtualisation control for a data processing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Niesser, Otto Schloss Str. 24 90584 Allersberg / DE | 02 /
Ünver, Halil Caglar Mohrengasse 2 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [2013/14] | Application number, filing date | 11183137.6 | 28.09.2011 | [2013/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2575040 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/455, G06F9/48 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G06F9/45533 (EP);
G06F9/4812 (EP);
G06F2209/481 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren für die Verarbeitung von Unterbrechungsanforderungen eines Datenverarbeitungsgerätes und Virtualisierungssteuerung für ein Datenverarbeitungsgerät | [2013/14] | English: | Method for processing interruption requirements of a data processing device and virtualisation control for a data processing device | [2013/14] | French: | Procédé de traitement de demandes d'interruption d'un appareil de traitement de données et commande de virtualisation pour un appareil de traitement de données | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.01.2020 | 09.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | 06.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US7209994 (KLAIBER ALEXANDER C [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A] - Wikipedia, "Message Signaled Interrupts", (20110818), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Message_Signaled_Interrupts, (20120119), XP055016923 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |