EP2444805 - Detection of mesothelin-/megakaryocyte potentiating factor-related peptides in peritoneal fluid for assessment of the peritoneum and the peritoneal cavity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujirebio America, Inc. 2751 Centerville Road, Suite 3206 Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'Shannessy, Daniel J. 912 Hickory Grove Drive Limerick PA Pennsylvania 19468 / US | 02 /
Sardesai, Niranjan Y. 102 Savory Lane North Wales PA Pennsylvania 19454 / US | 03 /
Sommers, Elizabeth B. 530 N. Five Points Road Coatesville PA Pennsylvania 19320 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Olgemöller, Luitgard Maria Patentanwältin Lindenstraße 12a 81545 München / DE | [2012/17] | Application number, filing date | 11183171.5 | 21.01.2005 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | US20040538072P | 21.01.2004 Original published format: US 538072 P | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2444805 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2444805 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G01N33/57407 (EP,US);
G01N33/57488 (EP,US);
G01N2800/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/17] | Title | German: | Erkennung von Mesothelin-/Megakaryozyten zur Potenzierung von faktorbezogenen Peptiden in peritonealer Flüssigkeit zur Bewertung des Peritoneum und Peritonealhöhle | [2012/17] | English: | Detection of mesothelin-/megakaryocyte potentiating factor-related peptides in peritoneal fluid for assessment of the peritoneum and the peritoneal cavity | [2012/17] | French: | Détection de peptides relatifs au facteur de potentialisation des mésothélines-/mégacaryocytes dans le fluide péritonéal à des fins d'évaluation du péritoine et de la cavité péritonéale | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 28.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/24] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05712014.9 / EP1714151 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050712014) is 18.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6083502 (PASTAN IRA [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * column 2 - column 15 * * column 27 - column 28; sequence 2 * [Y] 2-11,13-17; | [X]WO0050900 (PACIFIC NORTHWEST RESEARCH INS [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 1 - page 45; examples 1,2,7,8; claims 1-7,20-26,30,34,37-40,44,50,53; sequences 1, 2, 13 *; | [Y]WO03021273 (PACIFIC NORTHWEST RES INST [US], et al) [Y] 1-17* claims 1,3,27,36,37 *; | [XP]WO2004083449 (FUJIREBIO AMERICA INC [US], et al) [XP] 12-17 * claims 1-84; sequences 1-5 *; | [Y] - SCHOLLER N ET AL, "Soluble member(s) of the mesothelin /megakaryocyte potentiating factor family are detectable in sera from patients with ovarian carcinoma", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (19990928), vol. 96, no. 20, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11531 - 11536, XP002153470 [Y] 1-17 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.96.20.11531 | by applicant | EP0125023 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0184187 | WO8702671 | US4816567 | WO9002809 | WO9117271 | WO9201047 | WO9209690 | WO9215679 | WO9218619 | WO9220791 | WO9301288 | US5223409 | US5225539 | US5320956 | US6083502 | WO0050900 | - CHANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 136 - 140 | - CHANG ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, no. 1, pages 136 - 140 | - SCHOLLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 20, pages 11531 - 11536 | - YAMAGUCHI ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1994), vol. 269, no. 2, pages 805 - 808 | - SCHOLLER ET AL., PROC. NATL., ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 20, pages 11531 - 11536 | - KOHLER, MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 497 | - KOZBOR ET AL., IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1983), vol. 4, page 72 | - COLE ET AL., Monoclonal Antibodies and Cancer Therapy, ALAN R. LISS, INC., (1985), pages 77 - 96 | - FUCHS ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1991), vol. 9, pages 1370 - 1372 | - HAY ET AL., HUM. ANTIBOD. HYBRIDOMAS, (1992), vol. 3, pages 81 - 85 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - GRIFFITHS ET AL., EMBO J., (1993), vol. 12, pages 725 - 734 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 1041 - 1043 | - LIU ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 3439 - 3443 | - LIU ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 139, pages 3521 - 3526 | - SUN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, pages 214 - 218 | - NISMMURA, CANCER RES., (1987), vol. 47, pages 999 - 1005 | - WOOD ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 446 - 449 | - SHAW ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1988), vol. 80, pages 1553 - 1559 | - MORRISON, SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, pages 1202 - 1207 | - OI ET AL., BIO/TECHNIQUES, (1986), vol. 4, page 214 | - JONES ET AL., NATURE, (1986), vol. 321, pages 552 - 525 | - VERHOEYAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, page 1534 | - BEIDLER ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1988), vol. 141, pages 4053 - 4060 | - SCHOLLER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, no. 12, pages 11531 - 11536 | - HOLLENBAUGH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METH., (1995), vol. 188, pages 1 - 7 |