EP2444812 - IMPROVED IMMUNOASSAY METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/17] | Improved immunoassay methods | ||
[2015/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oncimmune LTD Clinical Sciences Building, City Hospital Hucknall Road Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Robertson, John Forsyth Russell ONCIMMUNE LTD Clinical Sciences Building City Hospital Hucknall Road Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB | 02 /
Murray, Andrea ONCIMMUNE LTD Clinical Sciences Building City Hospital Hucknall Road Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB | 03 /
Chapman, Caroline ONCIMMUNE LTD Clinical Sciences Building City Hospital Hucknall Road Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB | 04 /
Barnes, Tony 5007 Village Terrace Drive Dunwoody, GA 30338 / US | [2015/49] |
Former [2012/17] | 01 /
Robertson, John Forsyth Russell ONCIMMUNE LTD Clinical Sciences Building City Hospital Hucknall Road Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB | ||
02 /
Murray, Andrea ONCIMMUNE LTD Clinical Sciences Building City Hospital Hucknall Road Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB | |||
03 /
Chapman, Caroline ONCIMMUNE LTD Clinical Sciences Building City Hospital Hucknall Road Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG5 1PB / GB | |||
04 /
Barnes, Tony 5007 Village Terrace Drive Dunwoody, GA Georgia 30338 / US | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/17] | White, Nina Louise Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 11183188.9 | 12.09.2007 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | US20060844158P | 13.09.2006 Original published format: US 844158 P | GB20060018055 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: GB 0618055 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2444812 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2444812 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | [2012/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444812 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/574, G01N33/564, G01N33/68 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
G01N33/564 (EP);
G01N33/53 (GB);
G01N33/57488 (EP);
G01N33/6854 (EP);
G01N2800/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/49] |
Former [2012/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE IMMUNOASSAYVERFAHREN | [2015/26] | English: | IMPROVED IMMUNOASSAY METHODS | [2015/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉS AMÉLIORÉS DE DOSAGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE | [2015/26] |
Former [2012/17] | Verbesserte Immunoassayverfahren | ||
Former [2012/17] | Improved immunoassay methods | ||
Former [2012/17] | Procédés améliorés de dosage immunologique | Examination procedure | 09.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 04.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 30.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07804276.9 / EP2062053 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070804276) is 18.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 30.01.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 30.01.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.09.2007 | BG | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | PL | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | TR | 02.12.2015 | IS | 02.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 12.09.2007 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
TR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.09.2007 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | IS | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | LT | 02.12.2015 | |
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
PL | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 02.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9958978 (UNIV NOTTINGHAM [GB], et al); | [Y]GB2395270 (UNIV NOTTINGHAM [GB]); | by applicant | WO9958978 | WO9958979 | WO2004044590 |