EP2438970 - Heel piece of ski binding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blanchet, M Rita Frazione San Sicario, 30 10054 Cesana Torinese (TO) / IT | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rigat, Marco Frazione San Sicario, s.n.c. 10054 Cesana Torinese / IT | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Di Gennaro, Sergio Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele II, 61 10128 Torino / IT | [2012/15] | Application number, filing date | 11183250.7 | 29.09.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | IT2010TO00809 | 05.10.2010 Original published format: IT TO20100809 | [2012/15] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2438970 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63C9/08, A63C9/084, // A63C9/086 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
A63C9/084 (EP);
A63C9/0807 (EP);
A63C9/08521 (EP);
A63C9/086 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Fersenhalter einer Skibindung | [2012/15] | English: | Heel piece of ski binding | [2012/15] | French: | Butée arrière d'une fixation de ski | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 12.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/14] | 15.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AL]CH126223 (AMMETER FRIEDRICH [CZ]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 3; figures 1-5 * [L] ; | [A]US3379447 (ASHTON WEBSTER GORDON) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 40 - column 3, line 63; figure 10 * * column 6, line 55 - column 7, line 8; figure 12 *; | [AL]US3797841 (MC AUSLAND R) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 36; figure 2 * [L] ; | [A]US4403789 (HICKEY ROBERT J [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 51; figures 6-10 *; | [XPI]FR2957264 (EURL GIGNOUX [FR]) [XP] 1 * page 1, line 33 - page 2, line 51; figure 1 * [I] 2 |