EP2444284 - Lighting and signalling device of an automobile and operating method of such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/17] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, Rue Saint André 93012 Bobigny / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Albou, Pierre 16 rue Boussingault 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
De Lamberterie, Antoine 46, rue Edouard Pailleron 75019 Paris / FR | 03 /
Dubosc, Christophe 2, rue Saint Charles 93250 Villemomble / FR | 04 /
Mornet, Eric 12 avenue du Maréchal Maunoury 94130 Nogent sur Marne / FR | 05 /
Meyrenaud, Jean-Luc 14, Allée des Bosquets 93190 Livry Gargan / FR | 06 /
Reiss, Benoît 21 Allée François Mauriac 95580 Margency / FR | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/17] | Application number, filing date | 11183277.0 | 29.09.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | FR20100057856 | 29.09.2010 Original published format: FR 1057856 | [2012/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444284 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/28, F21V14/04 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
B60Q1/28 (EP);
F21S41/635 (EP);
F21S41/675 (EP);
B60Q2400/30 (EP);
F21S41/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungs- und Signalvorrichtung für ein Automobil und Funktionsverfahren einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2012/17] | English: | Lighting and signalling device of an automobile and operating method of such a device | [2012/17] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage et de signalisation d'un véhicule automobile et procédé de fonctionnement d'un tel dispositif | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2012 | Examination requested [2012/51] | 15.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 02.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.01.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 27.01.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.02.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 15.02.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 15.02.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, LU, ES, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 06.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 06.11.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 06.11.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.03.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2009144024 (OSRAM GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10-13,15,16 * page 18 - page 20, line 31 * * figures 1,2,5 *; | [X]DE10351182 (PORSCHE AG [DE]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1637397 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1,4,10,12,13,15,16 * paragraphs [0036] - [0041] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0059] * * figure 3 *; | [X]EP2058585 (ZIZALA LICHTSYSTEME GMBH [AT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10-13,16 * paragraphs [0055] - [0057] * * figures 5,11,13 *; | [X]EP1382900 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [X] 1,3,10,15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 46] - [0050] * * the whole document *; | [X]EP2072888 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3,10,15 * the whole document * |