EP2574248 - Rectangular sheet capable of being used as blanket or mat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ONYONE Co., Ltd. 4327, Takami-machi Nagaoka-shi, Niigata 940-8548 / JP | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onda, Hironori c/o ONYONE CO., LTD. 4327, Takami-machi Nagaoka-shi Niigata, 940-8548 / JP | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11183475.0 | 30.09.2011 | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574248 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A41D3/08, A41D15/04, A47G9/06 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
A41D3/08 (EP);
A41D15/04 (EP);
A47G9/064 (EP);
A41D2200/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/14] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rechteckiges Flächengebilde zur Verwendung als Decke oder Matte | [2013/14] | English: | Rectangular sheet capable of being used as blanket or mat | [2013/14] | French: | Drap rectangulaire susceptible d'être utilisé comme une couverture ou un tapis | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 29.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 07.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5946723 (DIPRATO MOLLY L [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 2, line 38 - line 62 *; | [A]WO2005036995 (VOF LODGER [NL], et al) [A] 1,3 * page 2, line 14 - line 28 *; | [A]DE640645 (FRITZ HOFFMANN) [A] 1 * page 1, line 62 - page 2, line 48 *; | [A]US6408462 (MOORE AMANDA [US]) [A] 1 * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 16; figure 2 * * column 7, lines 25-31 *; | [A]GB2275417 (JEFFERY MELANIE AVRIL [GB]) [A] 1,4,5 * page 2, line 28 - page 3, line 10 * | by applicant | JPS632711U | JPH11103995 |