EP2442547 - User equipment and method for providing augmented reality (AR) service [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd Pantech Bldg. R&D Center I-2 DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu, Seoul 121-270 / KR | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hwang, Ju Hee Pantech R&D Center, I-2, DMC Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu 121-270 Seoul / KR | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Herzog, Markus Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11183744.9 | 04.10.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | KR20100100008 | 13.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100100008 | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2442547 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2442547 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/32, G06T11/60, G06T19/00, H04N101/00, H04N1/00 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H04N1/32101 (EP,KR,US);
G06T19/006 (EP,KR,US);
G06T11/60 (EP,KR,US);
H04N1/00244 (EP,KR,US);
H04N2101/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04N2201/0084 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/16] | H04N1/32, G06T11/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Benutzergeräte und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung eines vergrößerten Realitätsdienstes | [2012/16] | English: | User equipment and method for providing augmented reality (AR) service | [2012/16] | French: | Équipement utilisateur et procédé pour la fourniture d'un service à réalité améliorée | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/34] | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0073888 (IBM [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,9,10* page 6, line 35 - page 7, line 7; figure 5 *; | [XYI]US2006001757 (SAWACHI YOUICHI [JP]) [X] 1,7,11,12 * paragraphs [0033] , [0034] , [0039] , [0042] , [0045] , [0046] , [0052] , [0053] , [0056] , [0058] , [0059] , [0092] , [0100] , [0101] , [0113]; figures 12, 15 * [Y] 3-5,9,10 [I] 2,6,8; | [XI]EP1924083 (FUNAI ELECTRIC CO [JP]) [X] 7,12 * paragraphs [0016] , [0 18] , [0 25] , [0 26] , [0 31] , [0 38] , [0 42]; figure 2 * [I] 8 |