EP2579485 - Method and system for receiving an optical-duo-binary signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states u2t Photonics AG Reuchlinstraße 10/11 10553 Berlin / DE | [2013/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bottacchi, Stefano Dr. via Don Gnocchi, 33 20148 Milano / IT | [2013/15] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Uwe Patentanwalt Moritzstraße 22 13597 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Fischer, Uwe Patentanwalt Moritzstraße 22 13597 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11183827.2 | 04.10.2011 | [2013/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2579485 | Date: | 10.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2579485 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/66 | [2013/15] | CPC: |
H04B10/675 (EP,US);
H04B10/6972 (US);
H04J14/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Empfang eines optischen duobinären Signals | [2013/15] | English: | Method and system for receiving an optical-duo-binary signal | [2013/15] | French: | Procédé et système pour recevoir un signal binaire optique double | [2013/15] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2012 | Examination requested [2013/15] | 17.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2011 | AL | 22.05.2013 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | HR | 22.05.2013 | IS | 22.05.2013 | LT | 22.05.2013 | LV | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | MK | 22.05.2013 | MT | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | RS | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | SM | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | NO | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | IE | 04.10.2013 | LU | 04.10.2013 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IS | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
IS | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
MT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.10.2011 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
LU | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
MK | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
SM | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
IE | 04.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
LV | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
HR | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RS | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
LT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 22.05.2013 | |
NO | 22.08.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6697576 (ROLLINS DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [XYI] - ZHENG X ET AL, "Optimisation of optical receiver for 10 Gbit/s optical duobinary transmission system", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE. (OFC). TECHNICAL DIGEST POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. ANAHEIM, CA, MARCH 17 - 22, 2001; [TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS SERIES. TOPS. VOLUME 54], WASHINGTON, WA : OSA, US, (20010317), ISBN 978-1-55752-655-7, page WDD64, XP031969533 [X] 1,6 * the whole document * [Y] 12-14 [I] 2-5,7-11 | [Y] - CHRISTIAN MALOUIN ET AL, "Differential Phase-Shift Keying Receiver Design Applied to Strong Optical Filtering", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20071101), vol. 25, no. 11, doi:10.1109/JLT.2007.907750, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 3536 - 3542, XP011195953 [Y] 12-14 * page 3537, column l; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JLT.2007.907750 | [A] - JOHN D DOWNIE ET AL, "Experimental Measurements of the Effectiveness of MLSE against Narrowband Optical Filtering Distortion", OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION NATIONAL FIBER OPTIC ENGINEERS CONFERENCE. OFCNFOEC 2007, 25-29 MARCH 2007, ANAHEIM, CA, USA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20070301), ISBN 978-1-55752-831-5, pages 1 - 3, XP031146521 [A] 1-14 * abstract * | [A] - LONGHI S ET AL, "Synthesis of fiber Bragg grating filters for optimal DPSK demodulation", OPTICAL FIBER TECHNOLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, US, vol. 14, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.YOFTE.2007.12.001, ISSN 1068-5200, (20081001), pages 259 - 261, (20080118), XP025409578 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yofte.2007.12.001 | [A] - JINGUJI K ET AL, "Synthesis of One-Input M-Output Optical FIR Lattice Circuits", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20080401), vol. 26, no. 7, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 853 - 866, XP011207203 [A] 1-14 * abstract * |