EP2439605 - Navigation of mobile devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics (Research & Development) Limited Planar House Parkway, Globe Park Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [2012/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morgan, Michael c/o STMicroelectronics (Research & Development) Limited Planar House Parkway, Globe Park Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Style, Kelda Camilla Karen Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 11184010.4 | 05.10.2011 | [2012/15] | Priority number, date | GB20100016820 | 06.10.2010 Original published format: GB 201016820 | [2012/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2439605 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2439605 | Date: | 27.01.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
G05D1/0234 (EP,US);
G01C21/20 (GB);
G05D1/0246 (GB)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/36] |
Former [2012/15] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Navigation von mobilen Geräten | [2012/15] | English: | Navigation of mobile devices | [2012/15] | French: | Navigation de dispositifs mobiles | [2012/15] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2016 | Examination requested [2016/36] | 27.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2018 | 26.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/09] | 20.10.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1608157 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2006184013 (EMANUEL DAVID C [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US2007276558 (KIM KYEONG-KEUN [KR]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO2009098319 (TRW LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [Y] - SOOYONG LEE ET AL, "Mobile robot localization using infrared light reflecting landmarks", CONTROL, AUTOMATION AND SYSTEMS, 2007. ICCAS '07. INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, ANONYMOUS, SEOUL, KOREA, (20071017), ISBN 978-89-950038-6-2, pages 674 - 677, XP031224205 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * |