Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
31.05.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.12.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 | Change - classification | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 | Change - classification | published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
06.12.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.10.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.02.2013 | Change - applicant | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
04.05.2012 | Change - inventor | published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
01.05.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |