EP2448376 - Electronic pre-switching device and lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAG engineering GmbH Kleinbahnstrasse 27 59759 Arnsberg / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states BAG engineering GmbH Heidestrasse 4 59759 Arnsberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Honerkamp, Stefan Kronsbrink 10 49152 Bad Essen / DE | [2012/23] | Representative(s) | Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 30 02 08 51412 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 11184161.5 | 06.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | DE20102013926U | 06.10.2010 Original published format: DE 202010013926 U | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2448376 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2448376 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/295, H05B41/39, H05B41/392 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H05B41/295 (EP);
H05B41/3925 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronisches Vorschaltgerät und Beleuchtungsgerät | [2012/18] | English: | Electronic pre-switching device and lighting device | [2012/18] | French: | Appareil de montage électronique et appareil d'éclairage | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2004012347 (RIBARICH THOMAS J [US]) [X] 1,12 * the whole document * [A] 2-11; | [XA]US2005128666 (POGODAYEV IGOR [US], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0040]; figures 5-8; claims 1-30 * [A] 2-11; | [XA]US6072282 (ADAMSON HUGH PATRICK [US]) [X] 1,12 * column 4, line 20 - column 13, line 6; figures 2a-2d * [A] 2-11; | [XA]US2006082330 (MONTANTE CHARLES J [US]) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0083]; figures 1-12; claims 1-14 * [A] 2-11 | by applicant | DE102008017513 | EP0404143 |