EP2404698 - Sealing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gühring OHG Herderstrasse 50-54 72458 Albstadt / DE | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bozkurt, Lutfi Schubertstraße 14 72474 Winterlingen / DE | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Meitinger, Thomas Heinz Bode Meitinger Patentanwalts GmbH Hermann-Schmid-Strasse 10 80336 München / DE | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 11184199.5 | 18.06.2010 | [2012/02] | Priority number, date | DE20091030327 | 24.06.2009 Original published format: DE102009030327 | DE20101008873 | 22.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010008873 | [2012/02] | Previously filed application, date | EP20100006322 | 18.06.2010 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2404698 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2404698 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q11/10, F16L23/16 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
F16L23/16 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/0261 (EP,KR,US);
B23B31/028 (EP,KR,US);
F16D1/076 (EP,KR,US);
F16L25/12 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2231/24 (EP,KR,US);
B23B2260/126 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2300/021 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T409/303976 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30952 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Abdichtung | [2012/02] | English: | Sealing device | [2012/02] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité | [2012/02] | Examination procedure | 26.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 27.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [ N /P ] | 10.10.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 10.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.10.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [ N /P ] | 28.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10006322.1 / EP2266750 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100006322) is 01.12.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2276945 (EHRICH DONN G) [I] 14,15* the whole document *; | [I]US5915896 (KOCZARSKI JACK B [US], et al) [I] 14,15 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 67; figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE10316394 (KENNAMETAL INC [US]) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0021]; figures 4,5 *; | [XYI]DE102005013483 (FRANZ HAIMER MASCHB KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10-13 * Vorrichtung mit dem Bezugszeichen 27; paragraph [0040]; figures 2,5 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 2; | [XYI]DE102006016883 (ZOLLER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8,10-13 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0046]; figures 2,3,5-8 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 2; | [Y]DE202006013413U (ROEHM GMBH [DE]) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0008]; figure 2 * |