Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9944506 | Global Dossier | 10.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9943971 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25761299 | 25.02.1999 | US7609398 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010091048 | Global Dossier | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009134314 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009105177 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008019001 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2009 | A3 | WO2008019001 | 14.02.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006049911 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97613804 | 27.10.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005063126 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2005 | A3 | WO2005063126 | 14.07.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004105626 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2005 | A3 | WO2004105626 | 09.12.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004075719 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A3 | WO2004075719 | 10.09.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004000126 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03105940 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2004 | A3 | WO03105940 | 24.12.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03092472 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2004 | A3 | WO03092472 | 13.11.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US13670002 | 30.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03089012 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2004 | A3 | WO03089012 | 30.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03011143 | Global Dossier | 03.07.2003 | A3 | WO03011143 | 13.02.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US91693701 | 27.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0243563 | Global Dossier | 06.02.2003 | A3 | WO0243563 | 06.06.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0241786 | Global Dossier | 24.04.2003 | A3 | WO0241786 | 30.05.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02100286 | Global Dossier | 19.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88021801 | 12.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0205717 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61868500 | 18.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02054957 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2002 | A3 | WO02054957 | 18.07.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02053036 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2002 | A3 | WO02053036 | 11.07.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US75352900 | 28.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0149184 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2002 | A9 | WO0149184 | 14.03.2002 | A3 | WO0149184 | 12.07.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0105320 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0100101 | Global Dossier | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0045854 | Global Dossier | 26.04.2001 | A3 | WO0045854 | 10.08.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0044295 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0033743 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0030531 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0016697 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2000 | A3 | WO0016697 | 30.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0012009 | Global Dossier | 03.08.2000 | A8 | WO0012009 | 29.06.2000 | A3 | WO0012009 | 09.03.2000 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022125417 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98102407 | 31.10.2007 | US202217569824 | 06.01.2022 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | US201313747530 | 23.01.2013 | US201816138248 | 21.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018344425 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78717710 | 25.05.2010 | US23820105 | 29.09.2005 | US46005209 | 13.07.2009 | US82305304 | 12.04.2004 | US201816047747 | 27.07.2018 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US201414268373 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018140224 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US201815862246 | 04.01.2018 | US201313750341 | 25.01.2013 | US201514608939 | 29.01.2015 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018071048 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113155628 | 08.06.2011 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US201514868663 | 29.09.2015 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | US201113301024 | 21.11.2011 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US201715818270 | 20.11.2017 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017079626 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414165116 | 27.01.2014 | US8250908 | 11.04.2008 | US201615369071 | 05.12.2016 | US88434901 | 18.06.2001 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US75617804 | 13.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016128797 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25832405 | 25.10.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US68412403 | 10.10.2003 | US71944803 | 21.11.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US201514925562 | 28.10.2015 | US75526110 | 06.04.2010 | US31710008 | 18.12.2008 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9649093 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2017 | B2 | US2016120510 | 05.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201314099352 | 06.12.2013 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US201614995667 | 14.01.2016 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US201213495408 | 13.06.2012 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US201514627691 | 20.02.2015 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016058433 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201514939320 | 12.11.2015 | US5999205 | 17.02.2005 | US498701 | 04.12.2001 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US201213543309 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9820824 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2017 | B2 | US2016015475 | 21.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113155628 | 08.06.2011 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US201514868663 | 29.09.2015 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | US201113301024 | 21.11.2011 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9237937 | Global Dossier | 19.01.2016 | B2 | US2015157418 | 11.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201314099352 | 06.12.2013 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US201213495408 | 13.06.2012 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US201514627691 | 20.02.2015 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9861294 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B2 | US2015141805 | 21.05.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US201313750341 | 25.01.2013 | US201514608939 | 29.01.2015 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9801688 | Global Dossier | 31.10.2017 | B2 | US2015051477 | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414519531 | 21.10.2014 | US201113155628 | 08.06.2011 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US201313946175 | 19.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014243675 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78717710 | 25.05.2010 | US23820105 | 29.09.2005 | US46005209 | 13.07.2009 | US82305304 | 12.04.2004 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US201414268373 | 02.05.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9510809 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2016 | B2 | US2014180163 | 26.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414165116 | 27.01.2014 | US8250908 | 11.04.2008 | US88434901 | 18.06.2001 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US75617804 | 13.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8965486 | Global Dossier | 24.02.2015 | B2 | US2014094698 | 03.04.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201314099352 | 06.12.2013 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US201213495408 | 13.06.2012 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8880154 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2014 | B2 | US2013310686 | 21.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113155628 | 08.06.2011 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US201313946175 | 19.07.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9044162 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2015 | B2 | US2013144157 | 06.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US201313750341 | 25.01.2013 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9216012 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2015 | B2 | US2012277626 | 01.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5999205 | 17.02.2005 | US498701 | 04.12.2001 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US201213543309 | 06.07.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8626270 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2014 | B2 | US2012253189 | 04.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US201213495408 | 13.06.2012 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8784433 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2014 | B2 | US2012215230 | 23.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213458206 | 27.04.2012 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9149341 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2015 | B2 | US2012116215 | 10.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113155628 | 08.06.2011 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | US201113301024 | 21.11.2011 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012078092 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113155628 | 08.06.2011 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | US201113301297 | 21.11.2011 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8626269 | Global Dossier | 07.01.2014 | B2 | US2011237943 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113155628 | 08.06.2011 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8498693 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2013 | B2 | US2011184280 | 28.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113082463 | 08.04.2011 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US21439808 | 18.06.2008 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8361082 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2013 | B2 | US2011166448 | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US201113037971 | 01.03.2011 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8219182 | Global Dossier | 10.07.2012 | B2 | US2010324416 | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8718745 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2014 | B2 | US2010298698 | 25.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US78717710 | 25.05.2010 | US23820105 | 29.09.2005 | US46005209 | 13.07.2009 | US82305304 | 12.04.2004 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9204866 | Global Dossier | 08.12.2015 | B2 | US2010268117 | 21.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US79448010 | 04.06.2010 | US22955308 | 25.08.2008 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | WO2004US05023 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8460204 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2013 | B2 | US2010262037 | 14.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | US79346510 | 03.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010198059 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25832405 | 25.10.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US68412403 | 10.10.2003 | US71944803 | 21.11.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US75526110 | 06.04.2010 | US31710008 | 18.12.2008 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8177792 | Global Dossier | 15.05.2012 | B2 | US2010094169 | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8224424 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2012 | B2 | US2010010342 | 14.01.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23820105 | 29.09.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US46005209 | 13.07.2009 | US82305304 | 12.04.2004 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009216118 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009204021 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009171198 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US31733908 | 19.12.2008 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009131825 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25832405 | 25.10.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US68412403 | 10.10.2003 | US71944803 | 21.11.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US31710008 | 18.12.2008 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009030309 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7970454 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2011 | B2 | US2009018439 | 15.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US21439808 | 18.06.2008 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9044215 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2015 | B2 | US2008319468 | 25.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22954508 | 25.08.2008 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008294039 | Global Dossier | 27.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008287828 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US14881808 | 23.04.2008 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US5645302 | 23.01.2002 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US75352900 | 28.12.2000 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8636734 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2014 | B2 | US2008281323 | 13.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US8250908 | 11.04.2008 | US88434901 | 18.06.2001 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US75617804 | 13.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8152737 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2012 | B2 | US2008077045 | 27.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US34286703 | 14.01.2003 | US81195207 | 12.06.2007 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | US3208301 | 21.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8360990 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2013 | B2 | US2008058675 | 06.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98102407 | 31.10.2007 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8343071 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2013 | B2 | US2008058672 | 06.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | US98114907 | 31.10.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008058640 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98029107 | 30.10.2007 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008039819 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8137346 | Global Dossier | 20.03.2012 | B2 | US2008021449 | 24.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US96775501 | 28.09.2001 | US89032907 | 06.08.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8147487 | Global Dossier | 03.04.2012 | B2 | US2007232955 | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US80729307 | 25.05.2007 | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | US85134204 | 21.05.2004 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007161925 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71436007 | 06.03.2007 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006155190 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25832405 | 25.10.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US34201106 | 27.01.2006 | US68412403 | 10.10.2003 | US71944803 | 21.11.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US36695606 | 02.03.2006 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006122503 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25832405 | 25.10.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US34201106 | 27.01.2006 | US68412403 | 10.10.2003 | US71944803 | 21.11.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006094983 | Global Dossier | 04.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US30315405 | 15.12.2005 | US1021301 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006084865 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25832405 | 25.10.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US68412403 | 10.10.2003 | US71944803 | 21.11.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7565191 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2009 | B2 | US2006036165 | 16.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23820105 | 29.09.2005 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US82305304 | 12.04.2004 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7329228 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2008 | B2 | US2005245842 | 03.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US17927705 | 11.07.2005 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US1021301 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005197594 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US11244905 | 21.04.2005 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | US72908603 | 05.12.2003 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US88021801 | 12.06.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005197593 | Global Dossier | 08.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US11215005 | 22.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005187491 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US11289405 | 22.04.2005 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005187490 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US11165905 | 21.04.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005187489 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13670002 | 30.04.2002 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US61986700 | 20.07.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | US61868500 | 18.07.2000 | US9896305 | 04.04.2005 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9408592 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2016 | B2 | US2005159677 | 21.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8229553 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2012 | B2 | US2005143674 | 30.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5999205 | 17.02.2005 | US498701 | 04.12.2001 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7792569 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2010 | B2 | US2005143656 | 30.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005119562 | Global Dossier | 02.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97613804 | 27.10.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7625347 | Global Dossier | 01.12.2009 | B2 | US2005090762 | 28.04.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US81918501 | 27.03.2001 | US65002703 | 27.08.2003 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8282573 | Global Dossier | 09.10.2012 | B2 | US2005065453 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7047063 | Global Dossier | 16.05.2006 | B2 | US2005063908 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US65891103 | 10.09.2003 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7651467 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2010 | B2 | US2005038462 | 17.02.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US91693701 | 27.07.2001 | US93318204 | 02.09.2004 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005010131 | Global Dossier | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US91374704 | 06.08.2004 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005004492 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US90378604 | 29.07.2004 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004236213 | Global Dossier | 25.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7983734 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2011 | B2 | US2004236212 | 25.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7229439 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2007 | B2 | US2004215187 | 28.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | US85134204 | 21.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7357801 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2008 | B2 | US2004204709 | 14.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | US88434901 | 18.06.2001 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US75617804 | 13.01.2004 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6993375 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2006 | B2 | US2004193044 | 30.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US82305304 | 12.04.2004 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7322940 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2008 | B2 | US2004171967 | 02.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US79066104 | 01.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004167432 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US79041604 | 01.03.2004 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004167431 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US79017304 | 01.03.2004 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7819819 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2010 | B2 | US2004167428 | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7189206 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2007 | B2 | US2004167427 | 26.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7322939 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2008 | B2 | US2004153004 | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US71961203 | 21.11.2003 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7282034 | Global Dossier | 16.10.2007 | B2 | US2004117652 | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | US72908603 | 05.12.2003 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US88021801 | 12.06.2001 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6996433 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2006 | B2 | US2004116806 | 17.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US71944803 | 21.11.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004101479 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US68412403 | 10.10.2003 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7229418 | Global Dossier | 12.06.2007 | B2 | US2003176812 | 18.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US34286703 | 14.01.2003 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | US3208301 | 21.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11589849 | Global Dossier | 28.02.2023 | B2 | US2019298319 | 03.10.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201916419482 | 22.05.2019 | US22954508 | 25.08.2008 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US201514700574 | 30.04.2015 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11534147 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2022 | B2 | US2019133562 | 09.05.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22955308 | 25.08.2008 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US201916239629 | 04.01.2019 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11246574 | Global Dossier | 15.02.2022 | B2 | US2019021705 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98102407 | 31.10.2007 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | US201313747530 | 23.01.2013 | US201816138248 | 21.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10335127 | Global Dossier | 02.07.2019 | B2 | US2015230778 | 20.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22954508 | 25.08.2008 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US201514700574 | 30.04.2015 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10231715 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2014039344 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313749241 | 24.01.2013 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US79346510 | 03.06.2010 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10172674 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | B2 | US2013281847 | 24.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US99032704 | 16.11.2004 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | US21439808 | 18.06.2008 | US201113082463 | 08.04.2011 | US59202009 | 18.11.2009 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US75369404 | 07.01.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US85228610 | 06.08.2010 | US201313922860 | 20.06.2013 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10172595 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2019 | B2 | US2008319342 | 25.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22955308 | 25.08.2008 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10105125 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2018 | B2 | US2013138014 | 30.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98102407 | 31.10.2007 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | US201313747530 | 23.01.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100135943 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2012517290 | Global Dossier | 02.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | WO2010US22993 | 03.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011518639 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | WO2009US02297 | 14.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2011516408 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US00945 | 13.02.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008508942 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US27071 | 29.07.2005 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007516048 | Global Dossier | 21.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | WO2004US43021 | 20.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2006528907 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14968 | 13.05.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005530554 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | US0318478 | 12.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005525130 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0220454 | 26.06.2002 | US91693701 | 27.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004533273 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0144265 | 26.11.2001 | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004523273 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | US0143360 | 16.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003518974 | Global Dossier | 17.06.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US0100543 | 04.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003517453 | Global Dossier | 27.05.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0002004 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003504148 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US0019505 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2003503098 | Global Dossier | 28.01.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US0017906 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002535069 | Global Dossier | 22.10.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US0002155 | 25.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002531211 | Global Dossier | 24.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9929126 | 08.12.1999 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002530139 | Global Dossier | 17.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9927453 | 17.11.1999 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526191 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921416 | 17.09.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002523170 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9919123 | 24.08.1999 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002510774 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US25761299 | 25.02.1999 | US9904138 | 25.02.1999 | US7609398 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4361211B | Global Dossier | 11.11.2009 | B2 | JP2002505136 | 19.02.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US9904471 | 02.03.1999 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2649946 | Global Dossier | 15.01.2020 | B1 | EP2649946 | 18.12.2013 | A3 | EP2649946 | 16.10.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | EP04713315 | 20.02.2004 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | WO2004US05023 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2641546 | Global Dossier | 17.02.2016 | B1 | EP2641546 | 25.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | EP04713315 | 20.02.2004 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2550927 | Global Dossier | 20.06.2018 | B1 | EP2550927 | 30.01.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP04752090 | 13.05.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2407111 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2015 | B1 | EP2407111 | 18.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | EP05776770 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2398391 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | WO2010US22993 | 03.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2389868 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2015 | B1 | EP2389868 | 28.12.2011 | A3 | EP2389868 | 30.11.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04815137 | 20.12.2004 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2319449 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2016 | B1 | EP2319449 | 11.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | EP01987032 | 16.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2303174 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | WO2009US02297 | 14.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2277553 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP00914446 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2244653 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US00945 | 13.02.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2046225 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US16902 | 27.07.2007 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2033580 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99911023 | 02.03.1999 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2025292 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP99911023 | 02.03.1999 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1974686 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2011 | A3 | EP1974686 | 01.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP00943279 | 28.06.2000 | EP05000690 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1919388 | Global Dossier | 26.12.2012 | B1 | EP1919388 | 14.05.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0143403 | 16.11.2001 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1811915 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97613804 | 27.10.2004 | WO2005US38027 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1781178 | Global Dossier | 14.12.2011 | B1 | EP1781178 | 09.05.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US27071 | 29.07.2005 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1733690 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP00904614 | 25.01.2000 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1696800 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2013 | B1 | EP1696800 | 06.09.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | WO2004US43021 | 20.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1626667 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2015 | B1 | EP1626667 | 22.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14968 | 13.05.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1599125 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | B1 | EP1599125 | 16.02.2011 | A4 | EP1599125 | 30.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | WO2004US05023 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1525856 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2008 | B1 | EP1525856 | 01.06.2005 | A3 | EP1525856 | 27.04.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP00943279 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1515642 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | US0318478 | 12.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1513581 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2013 | B1 | EP1513581 | 16.03.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0318728 | 11.06.2003 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1494721 | Global Dossier | 22.02.2012 | B1 | EP1494721 | 12.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0311767 | 16.04.2003 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1411834 | Global Dossier | 28.04.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0220454 | 26.06.2002 | US91693701 | 27.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1351609 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0149295 | 19.12.2001 | US75352900 | 28.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1255499 | Global Dossier | 13.11.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US0100543 | 04.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1196107 | Global Dossier | 27.10.2004 | B1 | EP1196107 | 17.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US0019505 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1189546 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2005 | B1 | EP1189546 | 27.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0017906 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1146910 | Global Dossier | 13.10.2010 | B1 | EP1146910 | 24.10.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0002004 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1146828 | Global Dossier | 24.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US0002155 | 25.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1139878 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2006 | B1 | EP1139878 | 10.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9929126 | 08.12.1999 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1130997 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2003 | A4 | EP1130997 | 12.09.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9927453 | 17.11.1999 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1115345 | Global Dossier | 18.07.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9921416 | 17.09.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1109496 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2012 | B1 | EP1109496 | 27.06.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US9919123 | 24.08.1999 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1059881 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9904471 | 02.03.1999 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3077801 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2022 | C | CA3077801 | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | CA2926638 | 20.02.2004 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3050373 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2021 | C | CA3050373 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2841505 | 20.12.2004 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2926638 | Global Dossier | 05.05.2020 | C | CA2926638 | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2766257 | 20.02.2004 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2841505 | Global Dossier | 27.08.2019 | C | CA2841505 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2550137 | 20.12.2004 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2825439 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2016 | C | CA2825439 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2550137 | 20.12.2004 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2775170 | Global Dossier | 05.09.2017 | C | CA2775170 | 30.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2659484 | 16.11.2001 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2766257 | Global Dossier | 28.06.2016 | C | CA2766257 | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2516663 | 20.02.2004 | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU7703501 | Global Dossier | 30.01.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US61868500 | 18.07.2000 | US0122894 | 17.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6351800 | Global Dossier | 05.02.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US0019505 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5926699 | Global Dossier | 10.04.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9921416 | 17.09.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5777500 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US0017906 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU5579299 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9919123 | 24.08.1999 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3929002 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0143403 | 16.11.2001 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3649002 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0144265 | 26.11.2001 | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3583500 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US0002004 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU3114700 | Global Dossier | 26.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9929126 | 08.12.1999 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2976599 | Global Dossier | 20.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US9904471 | 02.03.1999 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2790499 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US25761299 | 25.02.1999 | US9904138 | 25.02.1999 | US7609398 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2771601 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US0100543 | 04.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2634200 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US0002155 | 25.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010210724 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | WO2010US22993 | 03.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009241825 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | WO2009US02297 | 14.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009215896B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2013 | B2 | AU2009215896 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US00945 | 13.02.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005302639 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97613804 | 27.10.2004 | WO2005US38027 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004308386 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | WO2004US43021 | 20.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004243116B | Global Dossier | 16.12.2010 | B2 | AU2004243116 | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14968 | 13.05.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004216244 | Global Dossier | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | WO2004US05023 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003259025 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2003 | A8 | AU2003259025 | 17.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13670002 | 30.04.2002 | US0313520 | 28.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003245489 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2003 | A8 | AU2003245489 | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0318728 | 11.06.2003 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003238000 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | US0318478 | 12.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003225002 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2003 | A8 | AU2003225002 | 03.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0311767 | 16.04.2003 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002231094 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0149295 | 19.12.2001 | US75352900 | 28.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1738200 | Global Dossier | 13.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US9927453 | 17.11.1999 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2407119 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2015 | B1 | EP2407119 | 18.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | EP05776770 | 29.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE280542T | 15.11.2004 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US0019505 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE288228T | 15.02.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0017906 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE326905T | 15.06.2006 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE406141T | 15.09.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE484296T | 15.10.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0002004 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE536807T | 15.12.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US27071 | 29.07.2005 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE546105T | 15.03.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US0311767 | 16.04.2003 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE556657T | 15.05.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US9919123 | 24.08.1999 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0908034 | 04.08.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US00945 | 13.02.2009 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0910835 | 24.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | WO2009US02297 | 14.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1008139 | 15.03.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | WO2010US22993 | 03.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2322804 | 15.01.2008 | C | CA2322804 | 10.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9904471 | 02.03.1999 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2341528 | 05.01.2010 | C | CA2341528 | 09.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9919123 | 24.08.1999 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2344641 | 30.03.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9921416 | 17.09.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2348482 | 02.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9927453 | 17.11.1999 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2349723 | 15.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US9929126 | 08.12.1999 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2360582 | 03.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US0002155 | 25.01.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2361530 | 05.10.2010 | C | CA2361530 | 10.08.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0002004 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2376146 | 29.09.2009 | C | CA2376146 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0017906 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2378071 | 23.12.2008 | C | CA2378071 | 25.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US0019505 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2395225 | 12.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US0100543 | 04.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2445912 | 11.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0149295 | 19.12.2001 | US75352900 | 28.12.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2446883 | 18.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | US0143360 | 16.11.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2446993 | 02.06.2009 | C | CA2446993 | 30.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0143403 | 16.11.2001 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2455769 | 13.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0220454 | 26.06.2002 | US91693701 | 27.07.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2482305 | 15.02.2011 | C | CA2482305 | 30.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0311767 | 16.04.2003 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490066 | 19.07.2011 | C | CA2490066 | 24.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0318728 | 11.06.2003 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2490072 | 15.01.2013 | C | CA2490072 | 31.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | US0318478 | 12.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2516663 | 18.09.2012 | C | CA2516663 | 10.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | WO2004US05023 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2526592 | 29.10.2013 | C | CA2526592 | 09.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14968 | 13.05.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2550137 | 18.03.2014 | C | CA2550137 | 14.07.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | WO2004US43021 | 20.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2575805 | 26.08.2014 | C | CA2575805 | 16.02.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US27071 | 29.07.2005 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2584645 | 11.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97613804 | 27.10.2004 | WO2005US38027 | 21.10.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2606970 | 29.12.2009 | C | CA2606970 | 10.09.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | CA2322804 | 02.03.1999 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2659484 | 08.01.2013 | C | CA2659484 | 30.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2659484 | 16.11.2001 | CA2446993 | 16.11.2001 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2659518 | 30.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2446993 | 16.11.2001 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2661621 | 14.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US16902 | 27.07.2007 | US83574006 | 04.08.2006 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2673620 | 24.05.2011 | C | CA2673620 | 04.01.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2376146 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2715743 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2009US00945 | 13.02.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2722742 | 05.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | WO2009US02297 | 14.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2750583 | 12.08.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | WO2010US22993 | 03.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101048112 | 03.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US97613804 | 27.10.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101977561 | 16.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2009US00945 | 13.02.2009 | US7078608 | 21.02.2008 | US7078708 | 21.02.2008 | US88126407 | 26.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102056564 | 11.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US15064908 | 29.04.2008 | WO2009US02297 | 14.04.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102307529 | 04.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | WO2010US22993 | 03.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60015334T | 20.10.2005 | T2 | DE60015334D1 | 02.12.2004 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US0019505 | 15.07.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60017904T | 30.03.2006 | T2 | DE60017904D1 | 10.03.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0017906 | 28.06.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60040104D1 | 09.10.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60045094D1 | 25.11.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0002004 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69931517T | 21.12.2006 | T2 | DE69931517D1 | 29.06.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US9929126 | 08.12.1999 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1146910T | 10.01.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0002004 | 26.01.2000 | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2237435T | 01.08.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2313132T | 01.03.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2353684T | 04.03.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2377131T | 22.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US27071 | 29.07.2005 | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2381342T | 25.05.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0311767 | 16.04.2003 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2409758T | 27.06.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0143403 | 16.11.2001 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2428139T | 06.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | WO2004US43021 | 20.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2429419T | 14.11.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US0318728 | 11.06.2003 | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2435395T | 19.12.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | WO2004US05023 | 20.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2557584T | 27.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US1441304 | 16.12.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2561390T | 25.02.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004US14968 | 13.05.2004 | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2680969T | 11.09.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US44477003 | 23.05.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2773475T | 13.07.2020 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US37491503 | 24.02.2003 | US53227703 | 23.12.2003 | US64240603 | 15.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011008318 | 17.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US32274909 | 06.02.2009 | WO2010US22993 | 03.02.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1146910E | 02.12.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6638234 | 28.10.2003 | B2 | US2001002250 | 31.05.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6347241 | 12.02.2002 | B2 | US2001003791 | 14.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6689071 | 10.02.2004 | B2 | US2001014779 | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US81918501 | 27.03.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6659105 | 09.12.2003 | B2 | US2001017137 | 30.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | US7609398 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6676658 | 13.01.2004 | B2 | US2001039420 | 08.11.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | US88434901 | 18.06.2001 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6481462 | 19.11.2002 | B2 | US2002000253 | 03.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US25761299 | 25.02.1999 | US79844401 | 02.03.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6540693 | 01.04.2003 | B2 | US2002007130 | 17.01.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6662041 | 09.12.2003 | B2 | US2002038087 | 28.03.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US104301 | 31.10.2001 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7264596 | 04.09.2007 | B2 | US2002052564 | 02.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US1021301 | 04.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6679851 | 20.01.2004 | B2 | US2002058884 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US88021801 | 12.06.2001 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6508773 | 21.01.2003 | B2 | US2002058885 | 16.05.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | US3208301 | 21.12.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6997885 | 14.02.2006 | B2 | US2002068879 | 06.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US91693701 | 27.07.2001 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6699206 | 02.03.2004 | B2 | US2002068880 | 06.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97691601 | 11.10.2001 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7322938 | 29.01.2008 | B2 | US2002072688 | 13.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US92937101 | 13.08.2001 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7261712 | 28.08.2007 | B2 | US2002077628 | 20.06.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US96775501 | 28.09.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6958044 | 25.10.2005 | B2 | US2002087095 | 04.07.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US498701 | 04.12.2001 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7488295 | 10.02.2009 | B2 | US2002111564 | 15.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US98152501 | 16.10.2001 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6716179 | 06.04.2004 | B2 | US2002115943 | 22.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6170602 | 30.01.2002 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US72711200 | 29.11.2000 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6875182 | 05.04.2005 | B2 | US2002120211 | 29.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US13670002 | 30.04.2002 | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | US61986700 | 20.07.2000 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | US61868500 | 18.07.2000 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6567689 | 20.05.2003 | B2 | US2002161298 | 31.10.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US8711402 | 27.02.2002 | US65492000 | 05.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6862470 | 01.03.2005 | B2 | US2002188196 | 12.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US12475702 | 16.04.2002 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6712775 | 30.03.2004 | B2 | US2002193705 | 19.12.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US20254702 | 23.07.2002 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6758848 | 06.07.2004 | B2 | US2003023239 | 30.01.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US17993302 | 21.06.2002 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7377902 | 27.05.2008 | B2 | US2003144605 | 31.07.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US5645302 | 23.01.2002 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US75352900 | 28.12.2000 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7651505 | 26.01.2010 | B2 | US2003233101 | 18.12.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17440102 | 17.06.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6161034 | 12.12.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6240960 | 05.06.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US25761299 | 25.02.1999 | US7609398 | 26.02.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6261241 | 17.07.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6312429 | 06.11.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6331166 | 18.12.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6344026 | 05.02.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US20853598 | 09.12.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6427081 | 30.07.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US65492000 | 05.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6454727 | 24.09.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6471700 | 29.10.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US65492000 | 05.09.2000 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6497706 | 24.12.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US71717600 | 16.11.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6517498 | 11.02.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US7697398 | 03.03.1998 | US61986700 | 20.07.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US19612598 | 20.11.1998 | US61868500 | 18.07.2000 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6540695 | 01.04.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US14618598 | 01.09.1998 | US47725500 | 04.01.2000 | US5730398 | 08.04.1998 | US35618799 | 16.07.1999 | US23896599 | 27.01.1999 | US75352900 | 28.12.2000 | US15946798 | 23.09.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6725083 | 20.04.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US24193699 | 02.02.1999 | US71790900 | 20.11.2000 | US34397599 | 30.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006017400 | Global Dossier | 05.10.2006 | A8 | WO2006017400 | 18.05.2006 | A3 | WO2006017400 | 16.02.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2539457T | 01.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2557586T | 27.01.2016 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US91110604 | 03.08.2004 | Type | Earlier application | EP1781178 |