EP2407119 - A device for delivery of oner or more marker bodies through a tubular member of a biopsy device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | A device for delivery of one or more marker bodies through a tubular member of a biopsy device | ||
[2014/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senorx, Inc. 1625 West 3rd Street Tempe, AZ 85280-1740 / US | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shabaz, Martin V. 21421 Midcrest Drive Lake Forest, CA California 92630 / US | 02 /
Quick, Richard L. 22970 Bouquet Canyon Mission Viejo, CA California 92692 / US | 03 /
Louw, Frank R. 6188 Paseo Tienda Carlsbad, CA California 92009 / US | 04 /
Lubock, Paul 9 Pawtucket Laguna Niguel, CA California 92677 / US | 05 /
Safabash, Jason H. 30 Torres Pointe Alison Viejo, CA California 92656 / US | [2012/11] |
Former [2012/03] | 01 /
Shabaz, Martin V. 25421 Old Trabuco Lake Forest, CA California 92630 / US | ||
02 /
Quick, Richard L. 22970 Bouquet Canyon Mission Viejo, CA California 92692 / US | |||
03 /
Louw, Frank R. 6188 Paseo Tienda Carlsbad, CA California 92009 / US | |||
04 /
Lubock, Paul 9 Pawtucket Laguna Niguel, CA California 92677 / US | |||
05 /
Safabash, Jason H. 30 Torres Pointe Alison Viejo, CA California 92656 / US | Representative(s) | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | [2015/12] |
Former [2012/03] | Tomlinson, Edward James Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11184500.4 | 29.07.2005 | [2012/03] | Priority number, date | US20040911106 | 03.08.2004 Original published format: US 911106 | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2407119 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407119 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/00 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
A61B10/0275 (EP,US);
A61B10/0233 (US);
A61B10/0266 (EP,US);
A61B10/0283 (EP,US);
A61B90/30 (EP,US);
A61M1/77 (EP,US);
A61M1/92 (US);
A61B10/02 (US);
A61B17/32002 (EP,US);
A61B17/3417 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0208 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0225 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (US);
A61B2017/00473 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00486 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3405 (EP,US);
A61B2017/3454 (US);
A61B2090/0811 (US);
A61B2090/309 (US);
A61B2090/3908 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3987 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Applikation von Markierungselementen durch ein Tubuläres Element eines Biopsiegerätes | [2014/50] | English: | A device for delivery of oner or more marker bodies through a tubular member of a biopsy device | [2014/50] | French: | Dispositif d'application de marqueurs à travers un élément tubulaire d'un dispositif de biopsie. | [2014/50] |
Former [2012/03] | Gerät zur Applikation von Markierungselementen durch ein tubuläres Element eines Biopsiegerätes | ||
Former [2012/03] | A device for delivery of one or more marker bodies through a tubular member of a biopsy device | ||
Former [2012/03] | Dispositif d'application de marqueurs à travers un élément tubulaire d'un dispositif de biopsie | Examination procedure | 17.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/35] | 22.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05776770.9 / EP1781178 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   10.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2005 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | IE | 29.07.2015 | LU | 29.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5320613 (HOUGE REED A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5575794 (WALUS RICHARD L [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1,2,8,10 *; | [A]EP0966925 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-20 *; | [XA]EP1072288 (INDIGO MED INC [US]) [X] 1 * figures 1,32 * [A] 2-5; | [A]US6220248 (VOEGELE JAMES W [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 6,7 *; | [A]WO0128631 (DESCHUTES MEDICAL PRODUCTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure 53 *; | [A]WO0158505 (VYGON [FR], et al)[A] 1-5; | [A]WO02074214 (SUB Q INC [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 28, line 21 - line 27; figure 26 *; | [A]US2004024304 (FOERSTER SETH A [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * figures 1-8, 13, 14 *; | [XP]WO2005020925 (EMISPHERE TECH INC [US], et al) [XP] 1 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US6261241 | WO02069808 | US6471700 | US20020179933 | US20030444770 | US20030642406 | US20030532277 | US20040753694 | US20040847699 |