EP2458674 - An antenna system for a hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.11.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GN ReSound A/S Lautrupbjerg 7 2750 Ballerup / DK | [2012/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Özden, Sinasi Signalvej 145 1. tv. DK-2860 Søborg / DK | [2012/22] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Former [2012/22] | Nielsen, Camilla Rendal Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 11184503.8 | 10.10.2011 | [2012/22] | Priority number, date | DK20100000931 | 12.10.2010 Original published format: DK 201000931 | DK20110000272 | 07.04.2011 Original published format: DK 201100272 | DK20110070392 | 15.07.2011 Original published format: DK 201170392 | [2012/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2458674 | Date: | 30.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2458674 | Date: | 09.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/27, H01Q1/36, H01Q9/42, H04R25/00 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
H04R25/554 (EP,US);
H01Q1/245 (EP,US);
H01Q1/273 (EP,US);
H01Q1/36 (EP,US);
H01Q9/42 (EP,US);
H04R2225/021 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/22] | H01Q1/24, H01Q1/27, H01Q1/36, H01Q9/42, H01Q21/28, H04R25/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antennensystem für ein Hörgerät | [2012/22] | English: | An antenna system for a hearing aid | [2012/22] | French: | Système d'antenne pour aide auditive | [2012/22] | Examination procedure | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 16.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/49] | 14.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.07.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/49] | Divisional application(s) | EP14151170.9 / EP2725655 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1465457 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0029]; figures 14-17 * [I] 5-8,13; | [X]US2007229369 (PLATZ RAINER [CH]) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0044] - [0072]; figures 3-9 *; | [XA]WO2009098858 (PANASONIC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document * [A] 1-14; | [X]US2009243944 (JUNG KANG-JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0022] - [0028]; figures 1-3 *; | [XA]WO2010065356 (MOLEX INC [US], et al) [X] 15 * the whole document *[A] 1-14; | [X]EP2200120 (STARKEY LAB INC [US]) [X] 1-4,9-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 48] - [0051]; figures 5, 12-15 * | by applicant | WO2005081583 | US2010020994 |