EP2582021 - Electric machine and method for manufacturing it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Change - inventor | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Alstom Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Safari Zadeh, Hossein Högernweg 29 5504 Othmarsingen / CH | [2015/18] |
Former [2014/49] | 01 /
Safari Zadeh, Immanuel Högernweg 29 5504 Othmarsingen / CH | ||
Former [2013/16] | 01 /
Safari Zadeh, Hossein Högernweg 29 5504 Othmarsingen / CH | Application number, filing date | 11184531.9 | 10.10.2011 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2582021 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/20, H02K9/10 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
H02K9/12 (EP);
H02K5/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektrische Maschine und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2013/16] | English: | Electric machine and method for manufacturing it | [2013/16] | French: | Machine électrique et son procédé de fabrication | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 25.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB681077 (ALLIS CHALMERS MFG CO) [X] 1-4,10-12 * page 2, line 36 - page 3, line 54; figures 1,4 *; | [XAI]WO0117094 (ALSTOM UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 10 - page 13, line 8; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 6-8 [I] 10,12; | [A]EP2159905 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 9* paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figure 3 *; | [X]US7705496 (ZISLER MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,10-12 * column 2, line 8 - column 3, line 31; figures 2-4 * |