EP2441502 - Spherical puzzle with slidable and rotatable elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Galli, Giordano Regione Monferrina 1 14030 Frinco (Asti) / IT | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/36] |
Former [2012/16] | Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 11184748.9 | 11.10.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | IT2010BI00013 | 12.10.2010 Original published format: IT BI20100013 | [2012/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441502 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A63F9/08 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
A63F9/083 (EP);
A63F9/0838 (EP);
A63F9/0861 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sphärisches Puzzlespiel mit verschiebbaren und drehbaren Elementen | [2012/16] | English: | Spherical puzzle with slidable and rotatable elements | [2012/16] | French: | Casse-tête sphérique avec des éléments coulissants et rotatifs | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 03.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/15] | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]SU1161125 (EVDOKIMOV VLADIMIR S) [X] 1,3,6 * column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 31; figures 1-5 * [Y] 7-10 [I] 2,4,5; | [A]US5215305 (HSUN YAN-JU [TW]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1-6; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]US5389063 (WU OTTO [TW]) [Y] 9 * abstract *; | [Y]US2007057456 (LIU XUELIANG [CN]) [Y] 7-10 * figures 1-3; claims 1-8 * | by applicant | CN201283216Y | CN101007214 | CN2638800Y | CN2618652Y | CN2564210Y | CN2423003Y | CN2445783Y | CN2290370Y | CN2191015Y | CN2346475Y | US5816571 | CN2734287Y | US5575476 |