EP2581012 - A motor, fan and cyclonic separation apparatus arrangement for a vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Opposition rejected | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black & Decker Inc. 1207 Drummond Plaza Newark, Delaware 19711 / US | [2013/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smith, Kevin 130 High Street North Langley Moor Durham, Durham DH7 8JH / GB | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | SBD IPAdmin 270 Bath Road Slough, Berkshire SL1 4DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Cavalier, Marcus Alexander Mawson, et al Black & Decker 210 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 3YD / GB | Application number, filing date | 11184819.8 | 12.10.2011 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581012 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581012 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A47L5/24, A47L9/28, A47L9/16 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
A47L9/0081 (EP,US);
A47L5/24 (EP,US);
A47L5/28 (EP,US);
A47L9/0036 (EP,US);
A47L9/0045 (EP,US);
A47L9/02 (EP,US);
A47L9/106 (EP,US);
A47L9/127 (EP,US);
A47L9/1625 (EP,US);
A47L9/1641 (EP,US);
A47L9/165 (EP,US);
A47L9/1666 (EP,US);
A47L9/1683 (EP,US);
A47L9/22 (EP,US);
A47L9/2884 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/16] | Title | German: | Motor, Gebläse und zyklonische Trennvorrichtungsanordnung für einen Staubsauger | [2013/16] | English: | A motor, fan and cyclonic separation apparatus arrangement for a vacuum cleaner | [2013/16] | French: | Moteur, ventilateur et agencement d'appareil de séparation cyclonique pour aspirateur | [2013/16] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 17.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2016
26.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB Opponent's representative Macpherson, Carolyn May, et al, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Department Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | [2018/48] |
Former [2017/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.12.2016
26.10.2015
ADMISSIBLE Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB Opponent's representative Lerwill, Jonathan Ashley Ronald, et al, et al Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | ||
Former [2015/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.10.2015
Dyson Technology Limited Tetbury Hill Malmesbury Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB Opponent's representative Bloor, Sam, et al, et al Dyson Technology Limited Intellectual Property Deparment Tetbury Hill Malmesbury, Wiltshire SN16 0RP / GB | 25.11.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.11.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 28.06.2021 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2021/35] | Appeal following opposition | 09.01.2018 | Appeal received No. T0062/18 | 09.03.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.06.2021 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2011 | AL | 21.01.2015 | AT | 21.01.2015 | BE | 21.01.2015 | CY | 21.01.2015 | CZ | 21.01.2015 | DK | 21.01.2015 | EE | 21.01.2015 | ES | 21.01.2015 | FI | 21.01.2015 | HR | 21.01.2015 | LT | 21.01.2015 | LV | 21.01.2015 | MC | 21.01.2015 | MK | 21.01.2015 | MT | 21.01.2015 | PL | 21.01.2015 | PT | 21.01.2015 | RO | 21.01.2015 | RS | 21.01.2015 | SE | 21.01.2015 | SI | 21.01.2015 | SK | 21.01.2015 | SM | 21.01.2015 | TR | 21.01.2015 | BG | 21.04.2015 | NO | 21.04.2015 | GR | 22.04.2015 | IS | 21.05.2015 | IE | 12.10.2015 | LU | 12.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | IT | 12.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | NL | 01.11.2019 | [2020/48] |
Former [2020/39] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 21.01.2015 | ||
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
NL | 01.11.2019 | ||
Former [2018/46] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AL | 21.01.2015 | ||
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MK | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
PT | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
TR | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
AT | 21.01.2015 | ||
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CY | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
MT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
SM | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
IE | 12.10.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
MC | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
LU | 12.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
BE | 21.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SI | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
CZ | 21.01.2015 | ||
DK | 21.01.2015 | ||
EE | 21.01.2015 | ||
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RO | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
SK | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
LV | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
RS | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 21.01.2015 | |
ES | 21.01.2015 | ||
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IS | 21.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
PL | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
GR | 22.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
FI | 21.01.2015 | ||
HR | 21.01.2015 | ||
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
SE | 21.01.2015 | ||
BG | 21.04.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 21.01.2015 | |
LT | 21.01.2015 | ||
NO | 21.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 21.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1955631 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [A] 1-16 * column 6, lines 25-34 * * paragraph [0038] *; | [A]US2002189048 (MARUYAMA KANAME [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] *; | [A]US2003150198 (ILLINGWORTH LEWIS [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0004] *; | [A]US3513500 (HORI TAKEO) [A] 1-16 * column 5, lines 40-68 *; | [A]WO03070078 (MOLTKE IVAR [DK]) [A] 1-16 * page 6, line 13 - page 7, line 3 *; | [A]FR2865919 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [A] 1-4,6,7,9-13,16 * page 7, line 6 - page 10, line 29 *; | [A]WO2008009891 (DYSON TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-4,6,7,9-13,16 * page 3, line 25 - page 6, line 18 * | by applicant | EP1752076 | EP0042723 | GB2440110 |