EP2581470 - ELECTROLESS PALLADIUM PLATING BATH COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/16] | Electroless palladium plating bath composition | ||
[2016/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MKS IP Association Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2013/16] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstrasse 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirsekorn, Isabel-Roda Brandenburger Allee 21 14641 Paulinenaue / DE | 02 /
Wegricht, Jens Berliner Allee 90 13088 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Kilian, Dr. Arnd Wilhelmstraße 48 10117 Berlin / DE | [2013/16] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2016/39] |
Former [2013/16] | Wonnemann, Jörg Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent- und Markenabteilung Erasmussstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 11184919.6 | 12.10.2011 | [2013/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2581470 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2581470 | Date: | 28.09.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C23C18/44 | [2013/16] | CPC: |
C23C18/1637 (US);
C23C18/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/39] |
Former [2013/16] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | STROMLOSE PALLADIUMPLATTIERUNGSBADZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2016/22] | English: | ELECTROLESS PALLADIUM PLATING BATH COMPOSITION | [2016/03] | French: | COMPOSITION DE BAIN DE PLACAGE AU PALLADIUM ANÉLECTROLYTIQUE | [2016/22] |
Former [2013/16] | Stromlose Palladiumplattierungsbadzusammensetzung | ||
Former [2013/16] | Electroless palladium plating bath composition | ||
Former [2013/16] | Composition de bain de placage au palladium anélectrolytique | Examination procedure | 10.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/42] | 06.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.10.2011 | AL | 28.09.2016 | BE | 28.09.2016 | CY | 28.09.2016 | CZ | 28.09.2016 | DK | 28.09.2016 | EE | 28.09.2016 | ES | 28.09.2016 | FI | 28.09.2016 | HR | 28.09.2016 | IT | 28.09.2016 | LT | 28.09.2016 | LV | 28.09.2016 | MC | 28.09.2016 | MK | 28.09.2016 | NL | 28.09.2016 | PL | 28.09.2016 | RO | 28.09.2016 | RS | 28.09.2016 | SE | 28.09.2016 | SI | 28.09.2016 | SK | 28.09.2016 | SM | 28.09.2016 | TR | 28.09.2016 | IE | 12.10.2016 | LU | 12.10.2016 | CH | 31.10.2016 | LI | 31.10.2016 | MT | 31.10.2016 | FR | 28.11.2016 | BG | 28.12.2016 | GB | 28.12.2016 | NO | 28.12.2016 | GR | 29.12.2016 | IS | 28.01.2017 | PT | 30.01.2017 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
TR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
MT | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
TR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.10.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2016 | ||
CY | 28.09.2016 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
MC | 28.09.2016 | ||
MK | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | BE | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
GB | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | BE | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SI | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
IE | 12.10.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
FR | 28.11.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | BE | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
LU | 12.10.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | BE | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
CH | 31.10.2016 | ||
LI | 31.10.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | BE | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
DK | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
ES | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
IT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
SM | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
PT | 30.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/23] | BE | 28.09.2016 | |
CZ | 28.09.2016 | ||
EE | 28.09.2016 | ||
FI | 28.09.2016 | ||
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
PL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RO | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
SK | 28.09.2016 | ||
BG | 28.12.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
IS | 28.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
LV | 28.09.2016 | ||
NL | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
GR | 29.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
HR | 28.09.2016 | ||
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
RS | 28.09.2016 | ||
SE | 28.09.2016 | ||
BE | 31.10.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 28.09.2016 | |
LT | 28.09.2016 | ||
NO | 28.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 28.09.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0757121 (DUERRWAECHTER E DR DODUCO [DE]) [X] 1,7-10,13,14 * example 2; claims 1,6,7 *; | [X]US4066517 (STEVENS PETER, et al) [X] 1,14 * claims 1,5 * * column 1, lines 30-49 * * column 2, lines 56-66 * * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 55 *; | [X]US2009081369 (AIBA AKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 14 * example 1; tables 1-1, 1-2 * * page 2, paragraph 30 *; | [I]JP2005248192 ; | [YD]US5882736 (STEIN LUDWIG [DE], et al) [YD] 1-15 * examples 12,16 *; | [YD]GB2034756 (RICHARDSON CHEMICAL CO) [YD] 1-15 * claims 1-4 * | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 63, Database accession no. 2005-611257, XP002669553 & JP2005248192 A 20050915 (ASAHI ENG CO LTD) [I] 14 * abstract * | by applicant | US5882736 | GB2034756 |