15.07.2022 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
09.07.2022 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
08.05.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
23.02.2022 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
03.02.2022 |
Change: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
19.01.2022 |
New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure |
|
26.03.2021 |
Change: Date of oral proceedings |
|
26.03.2021 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
20.07.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal |
|
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
22.05.2018 |
Change: Appeal number |
|
18.05.2018 |
New entry: Appeal number |
|
18.05.2018 |
New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal |
|
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
08.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
08.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] |
04.11.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.11.2017 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.11.2017 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
03.11.2017 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
06.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] |
08.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
18.05.2017 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
16.11.2016 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
21.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.11.2016 [2016/47] |
07.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
06.07.2016 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
10.06.2016 |
Opposition filed |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
05.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.03.2016 [2016/10] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
22.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2016 [2016/08] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
11.09.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
31.07.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.07.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
21.07.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
08.05.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.03.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.01.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.11.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
24.10.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
18.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.09.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.07.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.03.2013 |
First examination report |
|
19.10.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.10.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
25.04.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] |