EP2444355 - Method for operating a winch of a tracked vehicle and snow groomer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kässbohrer Geländefahrzeug AG Kässbohrerstrasse 11 88471 Laupheim / DE | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Behmüller, Andreas Rieslingweg 7 89171 Illerkirchberg / DE | 02 /
Betz, Peter Kleines Eschle 24 88471 Baustetten / DE | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner mbB Kronenstraße 30 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [2022/33] |
Former [2015/36] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/17] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11185068.1 | 13.10.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | DE20101049984 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: DE102010049984 | [2012/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444355 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444355 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/36] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2444355 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | DE | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E01H4/02, B66D1/50, B66D1/34 | [2014/48] | CPC: |
B66D1/505 (EP);
E01H4/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | B66D1/34, B66D1/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/36] |
Former [2012/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Seilwinde eines Kettenfahrzeugs und Pistenraupe | [2012/17] | English: | Method for operating a winch of a tracked vehicle and snow groomer | [2012/17] | French: | Procédé de commande d'un treuil à câble d'un véhicule chenillé et dameuse | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/47] | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.06.2016
06.06.2016
ADMISSIBLE Prinoth S.p.A. con socio unico Via Brennero, 34 39049 Vipiteno (BZ) / IT Opponent's representative Eccetto, Mauro, et al, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2016/28] | 07.07.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 14.11.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 20.12.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.03.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.01.2022 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.05.2022 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 07.07.2022 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 18.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T1269/18 | 19.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 18.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 10.02.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 18.01.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.02.2022 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2011 | AL | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | CZ | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | ES | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | MT | 02.09.2015 | NL | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | RS | 02.09.2015 | SE | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | IE | 13.10.2015 | LU | 13.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | GB | 02.12.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | PT | 04.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.10.2011 | |
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/02] | HU | 13.10.2011 | |
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
LU | 13.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 13.10.2011 | |
BG | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
GB | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
GB | 02.12.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
IE | 13.10.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
PT | 04.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
ES | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NL | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RS | 02.09.2015 | ||
SE | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4475163 (CHANDLER WILLIAM R [US], et al) [A] 3-5 * column 6, line 30 - line 35 ** column 11, line 36 - line 39 *; | [A]CA2441650 (BOMBARDIER RECREATIONAL PROD [CA]) [A] 1-5 * paragraphs [0008] , [0052] * * figure 3 *; | [Y]EP1431236 (KAESSBOHRER GELAENDEFAHRZEUG [DE]) [Y] 2-5 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *; | [XY]WO2010095016 (ROLIC INVEST SARL [LU], et al) [X] 1 * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 20 * * figures 3,4 * [Y] 2-5 | by applicant | EP1431236 | Opposition | US4475163 | CA2441650 | EP1431236 | WO2010095016 |