29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
21.04.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
26.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.03.2016 [2016/13] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
26.06.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
13.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
18.07.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
17.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.06.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
28.02.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.01.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
31.01.2014 |
Change - English title |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
31.01.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
12.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
30.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
30.03.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
18.01.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
19.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|