EP2407115 - Instrumentation for use in a patellofemoral arthroplasty procedure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/03] | Orthopaedic surgical instrumentation and method for performing a patellofemoral arthroplasty procedure | ||
[2014/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DePuy Products, Inc. 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN 46581 / US | [2012/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Major, Lisa 3420 E East Ridge Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana 46582 / US | 02 /
Auger, Daniel D 6409 Post Road Fort Wayne, IN Indiana 46814 / US | 03 /
Wallage, Matthew 700 Orthopaedic Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana 46581 / US | 04 /
Farr, Jack 4287 N 400 W Bargersville, IN Indiana 46106 / US | 05 /
Brown, Scott 1311 Bluebird Drive Warsaw, IN Indiana 46580 / US | 06 /
Sokolov, Dimitri 1475 Ontario Lane Apt D Campbell, CA California 95008 / US | [2012/03] | Representative(s) | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2012/03] | Belcher, Simon James Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 11185257.0 | 30.07.2009 | [2012/03] | Priority number, date | US20080085805P | 01.08.2008 Original published format: US 85805 P | [2012/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2407115 | Date: | 18.01.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2407115 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2407115 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/15, A61B17/17, A61B17/16, A61F2/38 | [2012/03] | CPC: |
A61B17/1615 (EP,US);
A61B17/1767 (US);
A61B17/155 (EP,US);
A61B17/1675 (EP,US);
A61B17/1764 (EP,US);
A61B17/142 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/03] | Title | German: | Instrumentation zur Benutzung in einer patellofemoralen Arthroplastik | [2014/10] | English: | Instrumentation for use in a patellofemoral arthroplasty procedure | [2014/10] | French: | Instruments de chirurgie orthopédique utilisable dans une opération d'arthroplastie fémoro-patellaire | [2014/10] |
Former [2012/03] | Orthopädisches Operationsinstrument und Verfahren zur Durchführung einer patellofemoralen Arthroplastik | ||
Former [2012/03] | Orthopaedic surgical instrumentation and method for performing a patellofemoral arthroplasty procedure | ||
Former [2012/03] | Instruments de chirurgie orthopédique et procédé permettant de réaliser une opération d'arthroplastie fémoro-patellaire | Examination procedure | 03.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 28.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09791003.8 / EP2334243 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090791003) is 29.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2009 | AT | 20.08.2014 | BE | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | IT | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MK | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | SM | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | [2018/31] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 30.07.2009 | |
AT | 20.08.2014 | ||
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CY | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
SM | 20.08.2014 | ||
TR | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
IT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1374782 (DEPUY PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * figures 1,2,4-7,9-14 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0031] - [0041] , [0043] *; | [A]US2004153066 (COON THOMAS M [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 33,34 * * paragraphs [0070] - [0072] *; | [A]GB2398011 (WOZENCROFT ROBERT MICHAEL [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 10,11,14 * * page 20, line 28 - page 21, line 27 * * page 22, line 24 - page 23, line 8 * * page 25, line 14 - page 26, line 16 *; | [A]US2005187560 (DIETZEL STEVEN E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * figures 1-3,7-9 * * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] - [0040] , [0055] - [0059] - [0061] - [0067] *; | [A]WO2006127486 (SMITH & NEPHEW INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0066] , [0067] , [0075] , [0078] , [0081] - [0083] - [0086]; figures 5-8,13,14,19,20,31,32,33,34, * |