EP2441658 - Propeller support for a propulsion unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states De Giacomo, Maurizio Via A. Litta Modignani, 5 20161 Milano / IT | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Lunati & Mazzoni S.r.L. Via Carlo Pisacane, 36 20129 Milano / IT | [2012/16] | Application number, filing date | 11185458.4 | 17.10.2011 | [2012/16] | Priority number, date | IT2010MI01892 | 15.10.2010 Original published format: IT MI20101892 | [2012/16] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441658 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B63B3/42, B63H23/32 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
B63B3/42 (EP);
B63H23/326 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Propeller Stütz für eine Antriebseinheit | [2012/16] | English: | Propeller support for a propulsion unit | [2012/16] | French: | Support d'hélice pour unité de propulsion | [2012/16] | Examination procedure | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1028457 (LEO COSTA DR, et al) [X] 1-4,6,7 * figures 1-4 *; | [XY]DE3808710 (BLOHM VOSS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,10 * the whole document * [Y] 5,8,9; | [Y]US5248270 (FINKL ANTHONY W [US]) [Y] 8,9* figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP1182132 (FB DESIGN SRL [IT]) [Y] 5 * figures 4,7 *; | [X]EP1466826 (WAERTSILAE FINLAND OY [FI]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7 * the whole document * |