EP2444243 - Fluid resistant high temperature hose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2016 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veyance Technologies, Inc. 703 S. Cleveland-Massillon Road Fairlawn, OH 44333-3023 / US | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burrowes, Thomas George 2683 Radford Street N.W. N. Canton, OH 44720 / US | 02 /
Bates, Kenneth Allen 353 Granger Road Medina, OH 44256 / US | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstraße 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/18] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedrichstrasse 6 70174 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2014/09] | DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2012/17] | Dreiss Patentanwälte Gerokstrasse 1 70188 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 11185615.9 | 18.10.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | US20100907250 | 19.10.2010 Original published format: US 907250 | [2012/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2444243 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2444243 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444243 | Date: | 29.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B32B1/08, B32B25/02, B32B27/20, F16L11/08, B32B27/12, B32B5/10, C08K3/04, C08K5/02, B32B5/26, B32B15/02, B32B25/10, B32B5/02, B32B25/16 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
B32B1/08 (EP,US);
B32B15/02 (EP,US);
B32B25/02 (EP,US);
B32B25/10 (EP,US);
B32B25/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/322 (EP,US);
B32B5/028 (EP,US);
B32B5/10 (EP,US);
B32B5/26 (EP,US);
F16L11/082 (EP,US);
F16L11/086 (EP,US);
F16L11/088 (EP,US);
B32B2262/08 (EP,US);
B32B2264/102 (EP,US);
B32B2264/108 (EP,US);
B32B2307/536 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (EP,US);
B32B2597/00 (EP,US);
C08K3/04 (EP,US);
C08K5/02 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/17] | B32B1/08, B32B25/02, B32B27/20, F16L11/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/18] |
Former [2012/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsdichter Hochtemperaturschlauch | [2012/17] | English: | Fluid resistant high temperature hose | [2012/17] | French: | Tuyau haute température résistant aux fluides | [2012/17] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2011 | AL | 29.04.2015 | AT | 29.04.2015 | BE | 29.04.2015 | BG | 29.04.2015 | CY | 29.04.2015 | DK | 29.04.2015 | EE | 29.04.2015 | FI | 29.04.2015 | HR | 29.04.2015 | LT | 29.04.2015 | LV | 29.04.2015 | MC | 29.04.2015 | MK | 29.04.2015 | MT | 29.04.2015 | NL | 29.04.2015 | PL | 29.04.2015 | RO | 29.04.2015 | RS | 29.04.2015 | SE | 29.04.2015 | SI | 29.04.2015 | SK | 29.04.2015 | SM | 29.04.2015 | TR | 29.04.2015 | NO | 29.07.2015 | GR | 30.07.2015 | IS | 29.08.2015 | PT | 31.08.2015 | IE | 18.10.2015 | LU | 18.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.10.2011 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MK | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 18.10.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 18.10.2011 | |
AT | 29.04.2015 | ||
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
BG | 29.04.2015 | ||
CY | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
MT | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SE | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
SM | 29.04.2015 | ||
TR | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 18.10.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
IE | 18.10.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
BE | 29.04.2015 | ||
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
MC | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
LU | 18.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SI | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
PL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RO | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
SK | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
EE | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
DK | 29.04.2015 | ||
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 29.04.2015 | |
FI | 29.04.2015 | ||
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 29.04.2015 | |
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
IS | 29.08.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 29.04.2015 | |
HR | 29.04.2015 | ||
LT | 29.04.2015 | ||
LV | 29.04.2015 | ||
NL | 29.04.2015 | ||
RS | 29.04.2015 | ||
NO | 29.07.2015 | ||
GR | 30.07.2015 | ||
PT | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 29.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2138192 (EMIL OTT) [Y] 1,4-15 * page 1, column 1, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 1, column 2, line 15 - line 19 * * page 2, column 1, line 15 - line 22 *; | [A]US3485788 (CSASZAR FRANK C) [A] 1,2,4-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4753971 (DAVIS JR WILLIAM H [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [YD]US7748412 (MENNIG GARY [US], et al) [YD] 1,4-15 * column 2, line 60 - line 64; figure 1 * * column 3, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * column 4, line 3 - line 10 * | by applicant | US2503252 | US2586363 | US4128438 | US6376036 | US6440512 | US7614428 | US7694695 | US7748412 |