EP2446949 - Game system, program for game system and information recording medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Refusal of application | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Square Enix (also trading as Square Enix Co., Ltd.) 3-22-7, Yoyogi, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujisawa, Jin c/o SQUARE ENIX Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | 02 /
Anzai, Takashi c/o SQUARE ENIX Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Kyoko c/o SQUARE ENIX Co., Ltd. 3-22-7 Yoyogi Shibuya-ku, Tokyo 151-8544 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Korenberg, Alexander Tal Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/15] | Korenberg, Alexander Tal Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/18] | Pitchford, James Edward Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 11185672.0 | 18.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | JP20100241734 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010241734 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2446949 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2446949 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/12 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A63F13/12 (EP);
A63F13/493 (US);
A63F13/25 (US);
A63F13/30 (EP);
A63F13/537 (US);
A63F13/795 (US);
A63F13/822 (US);
A63F13/847 (US);
A63F13/335 (US);
A63F13/87 (US);
A63F2300/305 (EP,US);
A63F2300/407 (EP,US);
A63F2300/5533 (EP,US);
A63F2300/556 (EP,US);
A63F2300/572 (EP,US);
A63F2300/6036 (EP,US);
A63F2300/636 (EP,US);
A63F2300/65 (EP,US);
A63F2300/807 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Spiel-System, Programm für ein Spiel-System und Informationsaufzeichnungsmedium | [2012/18] | English: | Game system, program for game system and information recording medium | [2012/18] | French: | Système de jeux, programme pour le système de jeux et support d'enregistrement d'informations | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.2016 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 20.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2016/39] | 13.05.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2044987 (SONY COMP ENTERTAINMENT EUROPE [GB]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0061] ** paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0086] *; | [XI] - Electronic Arts, "Battlefield 2142", (2006), URL: http://www.replacementdocs.com/download.php?view.4676, (20130121), XP002690747 [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 6 * * page 14 * * page 15 * [I] 3 | [I] - Wikipedia, "Spawning (video gaming)", (20100619), Archive.org, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20100619092030/http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Spawning_%28video_gaming%29, (20130121), XP002690746 [I] 1-5 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2004105444 |