27.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
29.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
12.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
14.08.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] |
07.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.09.2015 [2015/37] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
22.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
10.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.05.2015 [2015/20] |
13.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
05.09.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
03.09.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
26.08.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.08.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.07.2014 |
Change - applicant |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
23.05.2014 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] |
06.05.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.04.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 |
Change - English title |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
11.04.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] |
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.08.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
25.07.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
18.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.04.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] |
10.02.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
25.01.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] |
24.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|