EP2448379 - Circuit board with integrated RFID microchip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beta LAYOUT GmbH Im Aartal 14 65326 Aarbergen / DE | [2015/25] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Beta Layout GmbH Im Aartal 14 65326 Aarbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hofmann, Arne Steubenstrasse 15 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei PartG mbB Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | [2015/25] |
Former [2012/37] | Hofstetter, Schurack & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Schurack, Eduard F. Hofstetter, Schurack & Skora Balanstrasse 57 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11185985.6 | 20.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | DE20102014862U | 28.10.2010 Original published format: DE 202010014862 U | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2448379 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2448379 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2448379 | Date: | 17.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/18, H05K1/02 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H05K1/0266 (EP,US);
H05K1/183 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09163 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10098 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10446 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/25] |
Former [2012/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Leiterplatte mit integriertem RFID-Mikrochip | [2012/18] | English: | Circuit board with integrated RFID microchip | [2012/18] | French: | Plaquette dotée d'une micropuce RFID intégrée | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 12.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 08.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.10.2011 | AL | 17.06.2015 | CY | 17.06.2015 | CZ | 17.06.2015 | DK | 17.06.2015 | EE | 17.06.2015 | FI | 17.06.2015 | HR | 17.06.2015 | LT | 17.06.2015 | LV | 17.06.2015 | MC | 17.06.2015 | MK | 17.06.2015 | MT | 17.06.2015 | NL | 17.06.2015 | PL | 17.06.2015 | RO | 17.06.2015 | RS | 17.06.2015 | SI | 17.06.2015 | SK | 17.06.2015 | SM | 17.06.2015 | TR | 17.06.2015 | BG | 17.09.2015 | NO | 17.09.2015 | GR | 18.09.2015 | IS | 17.10.2015 | PT | 19.10.2015 | LU | 20.10.2015 | BE | 31.10.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 20.10.2011 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MK | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 20.10.2011 | |
CY | 17.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 17.06.2015 | ||
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
MT | 17.06.2015 | ||
NL | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
SM | 17.06.2015 | ||
TR | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SI | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
MC | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
LU | 20.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
DK | 17.06.2015 | ||
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 17.06.2015 | |
EE | 17.06.2015 | ||
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
PL | 17.06.2015 | ||
RO | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
SK | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
IS | 17.10.2015 | ||
PT | 19.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 17.06.2015 | |
FI | 17.06.2015 | ||
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
BG | 17.09.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 17.06.2015 | |
HR | 17.06.2015 | ||
LT | 17.06.2015 | ||
LV | 17.06.2015 | ||
RS | 17.06.2015 | ||
NO | 17.09.2015 | ||
GR | 18.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1613134 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,8 * the whole document * [Y] 3-5,7; | [Y]US2009294534 (PEPORI PAOLO [IT], et al) [Y] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP2141970 (ELFAB AG ELETRONIKFABRIKATION [CH]) [Y] 5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007208294 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US6985112 (SADAMORI HIDETO [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH04271188 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-8 * figure - * |