EP2444953 - Device for bitmap display of two merged images [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Microoled 7 Parvis Louis Neel BHT Bâtiment 52 - BP50 38000 Grenoble Cedex 9 / FR | [2012/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haas, Gunther 26bis, rue du Foyer 38120 Saint-Egreve / FR | 02 /
Espuno, Laurent 2 rue Croix de la Rochette 38120 Le Fontanil / FR | [2012/17] | Representative(s) | Collet, Alain, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble Visium 22, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [2012/17] | Application number, filing date | 11186212.4 | 21.10.2011 | [2012/17] | Priority number, date | FR20100058684 | 22.10.2010 Original published format: FR 1058684 | [2012/17] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2444953 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2444953 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/20, G06T11/60 | [2012/17] | CPC: |
G09G3/20 (EP,US);
G09G5/377 (KR);
G06T11/00 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0452 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0407 (EP,US);
G09G2340/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2012/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Matrix-Anzeigevorrichtung für zwei verschmolzene Bilder | [2012/17] | English: | Device for bitmap display of two merged images | [2012/17] | French: | Dispositif d'affichage matriciel de deux images fusionnées | [2017/01] |
Former [2012/17] | Dispositif d'affichage matriciel de deux images fusionnees | Examination procedure | 25.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2012 | Examination requested [2012/49] | 18.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 02.12.2016 | 02.12.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2015 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.10.2011 | AL | 17.05.2017 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | IT | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | MT | 17.05.2017 | NL | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | IE | 21.10.2017 | LU | 21.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 21.10.2011 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 21.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
IT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
NL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6034481 (HAYNES BRYAN D [US]) [Y] 11* figures 3a,4,5 *; | [XYI]US6151030 (DELEEUW WILLIAM C [US], et al) [X] 1,4 * column 6, line 6 - column 7, line 35; figures 4,5 * [Y] 9,11,12 [I] 2,3,5-8; | [Y]US2006284872 (BROWN ELLIOTT CANDICE H [US]) [Y] 9,12 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0041]; figures 4-6 * | Examination | EP1742490 | US2007146242 | US2010110094 |