EP2447002 - Grinding method, grinding system and multifunction grinding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2018 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states JTEKT Corporation 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamaguchi, Satoshi c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | 02 /
Mizutani, Yoshihiro c/o JTEKT CORPORATION 5-8, Minamisemba 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 542-8502 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2012/18] | Application number, filing date | 11186728.9 | 26.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | JP20100241141 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010241141 | JP20100241158 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: JP 2010241158 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2447002 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2447002 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2447002 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B24B19/12, B24B27/00, B24B49/14, B24B49/16, B24B1/00 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
B24B49/14 (EP,US);
B24B1/00 (EP,US);
B24B19/125 (EP,US);
B24B27/0061 (EP,US);
B24B49/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | Schleifverfahren, Schleifsystem und Multifunktions-Schleifmaschine | [2012/18] | English: | Grinding method, grinding system and multifunction grinding machine | [2012/18] | French: | Procédé de meulage, système de meulage et meuleuse multifonction | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 13.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/13] | 09.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2011 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | ES | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | IT | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 26.10.2011 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 26.10.2011 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
ES | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004069472 (JUNKER ERWIN MASCHF GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,8 * page 16 - page 17; figure 3 * * page 19 - page 20 *; | [Y]US2009258576 (MIZUTANI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0078]; figure 11 *; | [Y]US5899797 (JUNKER ERWIN [DE]) [Y] 1 * column 1, paragraph 56 - column 2, paragraph 34; figures 4,5 *; | [AD]US5392566 (WEDENIWSKI HORST J [DE]) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]JP2009208218 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [Y] 1,2,8 * abstract *; | [Y]JPH08276354 (NISSAN MOTOR) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * | by applicant | US5392566 |