EP2447831 - Apparatus and method for generating applications automatically [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDS Co., Ltd. 707-19 Yeoksam-2dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-082 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Samsung SDS Co. Ltd. 707-19 Yeoksam-2dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-082 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jo, Young-Min 9-408, Jinju Apt. Jamsil 4-dong, Songpa-gu 138-795 Seoul / KR | 02 /
Song, Kye-Su 108-2501, Pureunmaeul Daewoo Apt. Pyeongchon-dong, Dongan-gu, Anyang Si 431-798 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | 03 /
Jung, Eun-Hee B-2416, Doosan We`ve Pavilion, Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam Si 463-848 Gyeonggi-Do / KR | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11186810.5 | 27.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | KR20100106349 | 28.10.2010 Original published format: KR 20100106349 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447831 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/44 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
G06F8/71 (EP,KR,US);
G06F8/36 (EP,KR,US);
G06Q50/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur automatischen Erzeugung von Anwendungen | [2012/18] | English: | Apparatus and method for generating applications automatically | [2012/18] | French: | Appareil et procédé de générer automatiquement des applications | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 27.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 02.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/30] | 08.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]GB2449944 (WECOMM LTD [GB]) [I] 1-11 * abstract * * page 12, line 21 - page 16, line l; figures 1,14,17 * |