EP2446771 - Applicator with application from front [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.09.2021 [2021/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEKA GmbH Waizendorf 3 91572 Bechhofen / DE | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geuther, Manuela Lindenstraße 3 91522 Ansbach / DE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Am Stein 10 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwalt Donaustrasse 6 85049 Ingolstadt / DE | ||
Former [2012/18] | Misselhorn, Hein-Martin, et al Misselhorn Wall Patent- und Rechtsanwälte GbR Bayerstraße 83 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 11186830.3 | 27.10.2011 | [2012/18] | Priority number, date | DE20102014794U | 27.10.2010 Original published format: DE 202010014794 U | [2012/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2446771 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2446771 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02, A45D40/26 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP,US);
A45D40/26 (EP,US);
A45D40/262 (EP,US);
A45D40/265 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1053 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Applikator mit Applikation von vorne | [2012/18] | English: | Applicator with application from front | [2012/18] | French: | Applicateur doté d'une application par l'avant | [2012/18] | Examination procedure | 15.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 13.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/35] | 14.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2020 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6076531 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-16 * column 6, lines 52-56 * * figures 1,5,6 * [I] 3,6; | [XI]US6412496 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 1-5,7-12,14-16 * column 13, line 49 - column 14, line 27 * * figures 17,17A,19 * [I] 6; | [XI]EP2070436 (INTERCOS ITALIANA [IT]) [X] 1,13,16 * figures 1,6 * [I] 2-12,14,15; | [XI]WO2010042878 (AVON PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1,16 * figures 1-12 *[I] 2-15 |