Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2426115 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2426115



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 480
12.08.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
14.04.2015 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of examination fee/designation fee/non-reply to Written Opinion) Search / examination 2
08.09.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
31.07.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.07.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 6
31.07.2014 European search report Search / examination 6
22.07.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
27.09.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
23.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
20.09.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
25.10.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.10.2012 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.02.2012 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
08.02.2012 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.11.2011 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
15.11.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2011 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
08.11.2011 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
27.10.2011 Abstract Search / examination 1
27.10.2011 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
27.10.2011 Claims Search / examination 32
27.10.2011 Description Search / examination 254
27.10.2011 Drawings Search / examination 4
27.10.2011 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4
18.01.2006 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 149